This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/10/2021 at 07:25:22 (UTC).

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE VS GERARDO CHAVEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB, AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GERARDO CHAVEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5534

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTOMOBILE CLUB AN INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

CHAVEZ GERARDO

CHAVEZ DAVID

CHAVEZ DANIEL

Cross Defendant

KENT STERLING ATTWOOD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CORONA SALVADOR

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

VALDEZ LARRY T.

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/17/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/4/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/4/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/12/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/12/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/10/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

8/10/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/10/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/9/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/10/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

6/10/2021: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/22/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

3/19/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Answer - Answer

12/22/2020: Answer - Answer

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/22/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

12/22/2020: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

12/22/2020: Demand for Jury Trial - Demand for Jury Trial

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/19/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2023
  • Hearing07/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • Hearing12/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Gerardo Chavez (Cross-Complainant); As to: Kent Sterling Attwood (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDefault entered as to Kent Sterling Attwood; On the Cross-Complaint filed by Gerardo Chavez on 12/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Gerardo Chavez (Cross-Complainant); As to: Kent Sterling Attwood (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Gerardo Chavez (Cross-Complainant); As to: Kent Sterling Attwood (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Gerardo Chavez (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff); As to: David Chavez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/15/2020; Service Cost: 150.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Gerardo Chavez (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 09/15/2020; Service Cost: 150.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Gerardo Chavez (Defendant); David Chavez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Gerardo Chavez (Defendant); David Chavez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club, an interinsurance exchange (Plaintiff); As to: Gerardo Chavez (Defendant); David Chavez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VALDEZ LARRY T.