This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/21/2019 at 01:10:28 (UTC).

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB VS PATTAM AVNU WANGNAIKOO, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/20/2018 INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PATTAM AVNU WANGNAIKOO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8722

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Plaintiffs

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB

CABRERA JONATHAN

Defendants and Cross Defendants

WANGNAIKOO PATTAM AVNU DBA ROWLAND HEIGHTS LUBE N TUNE

CABRERA JONATHAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MENDELSON LEE MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/18/2019

12/18/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/18/2019

Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

12/18/2019: Order - Dismissal - Order - Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/18/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/13/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Answer

8/8/2018: Answer

Summons - on Cross Complaint

8/8/2018: Summons - on Cross Complaint

Cross-Complaint

8/8/2018: Cross-Complaint

Proof of Personal Service

7/2/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/5/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - on Complaint

6/20/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/20/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/20/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/20/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/23/2021 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Filed by: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by Jonathan Cabrera, et al. on 08/08/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to Pattam Avnu Wangnaikoo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club on 06/20/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/18/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 12/18/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 94 - Hon. James E. Blancarte; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff); As to: Pattam Avnu Wangnaikoo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2018
  • DocketSummons on Cross Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff); As to: Pattam Avnu Wangnaikoo (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/30/2018; Service Cost: 92.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff); As to: Jonathan Cabrera (Defendant); Service Date: 06/28/18; Service Cost: 92.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff); As to: Pattam Avnu Wangnaikoo (Defendant); Jonathan Cabrera (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC08722    Hearing Date: February 27, 2020    Dept: 25

MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE DISMISSAL

(CCP § 473(b))

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club’s Motion for Order Vacating Entry of Dismissal is GRANTED.

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On June 20, 2018, Plaintiff Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for subrogation and indebtedness against Defendants Pattam Avnu Wangnaikoo dba Rowland Heights Lube N Tune (“Lube N Tune”) and Jonathan Cabrera (“Cabrera”) (collectively, “Defendants”). On August 8, 2018, Defendant Cabrera filed an Answer and Cross-Complaint against Defendant Lube N Tune.

A non-jury trial was scheduled for December 18, 2019. After the matter was placed on second call and because there were no appearances by either side by 9:01 a.m., the Court ordered the entire case dismissed without prejudice. (12/18/19 Minute Order.)

On January 13, 2020, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion for Order Vacating Entry of Dismissal (the “Motion”). To date, no opposition or reply briefs have been filed.

  1. Legal Standard & Discussion

Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 473, subdivision (b), an application for relief from a judgment, dismissal, order, or other proceeding taken against a party must be made no more than six months after entry of the order from which relief is sought and must be accompanied by an affidavit of fault attesting to the mistake, inadvertence, surprise or neglect of the moving party or its attorney. (Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (b); English v. IKON Business Solutions (2001) 94 Cal.App.4th 130, 143.)

Plaintiff’s Motion is timely. Plaintiff seeks to set aside the Court’s December 18, 2019 Dismissal due to Plaintiff’s counsel’s mistake and neglect. (Mot., Schwarz Decl., ¶ 6) Specifically, Plaintiff’s counsel states that he mis-calendared the hearing, and as a result did not appear for trial. (Id. at ¶ 4.)

Based on the timely request to vacate the dismissal supported by an affidavit of fault, Plaintiff’s unopposed Motion is GRANTED.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club’s Motion for Order Vacating Entry of Dismissal is GRANTED.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.