This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 17:40:04 (UTC).

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB VS MEI CUI

Case Summary

On 11/17/2017 INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MEI CUI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5036

  • Filing Date:

    11/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB

Defendant

CUI MEI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MENDELSON LEE MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

5/15/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 05/15/2019

5/15/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 05/15/2019

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/20/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/5/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration (name extension) - of Non Service

12/6/2017: Declaration (name extension) - of Non Service

Declaration (name extension) - of Non Service

12/1/2017: Declaration (name extension) - of Non Service

Summons - on Complaint

11/17/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/17/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

11/17/2017: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/17/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment/Dismissal scheduled for 09/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 05/15/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/20/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff); As to: Mei Cui (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketDefault entered as to Mei Cui; On the Complaint filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club on 11/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff); As to: Mei Cui (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/02/2018; Service Cost: 87.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Non Service; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2017
  • DocketDeclaration of Non Service; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff); As to: Mei Cui (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/20/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 17STLC05036    Hearing Date: March 03, 2020    Dept: 26

Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club v. Cui, et al.

MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL

(CCP § 473(b))

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club’S Motion to Vacate Dismissal is GRANTED. THE DISMISSAL ENTERED ON SEPTEMBER 16, 2019 IS HEREBY VACATED.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS SCHEDULED FOR 06/02/20 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. FAILURE TO APPEAR MAY RESULT IN THE ACTION BEING DISMISSED.

TRIAL DATE RESET FOR 09/01/20 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for automobile subrogation against Defendant Mei Cui (“Defendant”) on November 17, 2017. Following Defendant’s failure to file a responsive pleading, the Court entered her default on June 20, 2018. The Court set an Order to Show Cause Re Entry of Default Judgment/Dismissal for September 16, 2019. Upon Plaintiff’s failure to appear for the Order to Show Cause, the Court dismissed the action without prejudice pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 581, subdivision (b)(3).

Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Set Aside Dismissal on February 4, 2020. To date, no opposition has been filed.

Discussion

Plaintiff seeks relief from the dismissal entered on September 16, 2019 pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure, section 473, subdivision (b). Under this statute, an application for relief must be made no more than six months after entry of the order from which relief is sought and must be accompanied by an affidavit of fault attesting to the mistake, inadvertence, surprise or neglect of the moving party or its attorney. (Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (b); English v. IKON Business Solutions (2001) 94 Cal.App.4th 130, 143.)

The Motion is timely brought six months after dismissal of the action and is supported by an attorney affidavit of fault. Plaintiff’s attorney declares that he mis-calendared the date of the Order to Show Cause. (Motion, Schwarz Decl., ¶¶3-4.) Based on the timely request to vacate supported by an attorney affidavit of fault, Plaintiff’s Motion to Vacate Dismissal is GRANTED. THE DISMISSAL ENTERED ON SEPTEMBER 16, 2019 IS HEREBY VACATED.

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT IS SCHEDULED FOR 06/02/20 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. FAILURE TO APPEAR MAY RESULT IN THE ACTION BEING DISMISSED.

TRIAL DATE RESET FOR 09/01/20 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

Moving party to give notice.