This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 17:50:22 (UTC).

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB VS MAGALLY ARREOLA

Case Summary

On 02/15/2018 a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle case was filed by INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB against MAGALLY ARREOLA in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3134

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB

Defendant

ARREOLA MAGALLY

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

3/14/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration (name extension) - of Non Service

3/6/2018: Declaration (name extension) - of Non Service

Summons - on Complaint

2/15/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/15/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

2/15/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/15/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2021
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 94 - Hon. James E. Blancarte; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff); As to: Magally Arreola (Defendant); Service Date: 03/10/18; Service Cost: 92.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Non Service; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/15/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/18/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff); As to: Magally Arreola (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC03134    Hearing Date: January 22, 2020    Dept: 25

MOTION TO VACATE DISMISSAL

(CCP § 473(b))

TENTATIVE RULING:

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club’s Motion for Order Vacating Entry of Dismissal is GRANTED. THE DISMISSAL ENTERED ON AUGUST 15, 2019 IS HEREBY VACATED.

ANALYSIS:

I. Background

On February 15, 2018, Plaintiff Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (“Plaintiff”) filed an action against Defendant Magally Arreola (“Defendant”) for subrogation and indebtedness.

On August 15, 2019, during the scheduled non-jury trial, the appearing attorney for Plaintiff orally requested that the Complaint be dismissed without prejudice because the matter had settled. (8/15/19 Minute Order.)

On November 25, 2019, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion for Order Vacating Entry of Dismissal (the “Motion”).

To date, no opposition or reply briefs have been filed.

II. Legal Standard & Discussion

Plaintiff seeks to vacate dismissal entered on August 15, 2019 pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure, section 473, subdivision (b).

Under this statute, an application for relief must be made no more than six months after entry of the order from which relief is sought, and must be accompanied by an affidavit of fault attesting to the mistake, inadvertence, surprise or neglect of the moving party or its attorney. (Code Civ. Proc., § 473, subd. (b); English v. IKON Business Solutions (2001) 94 Cal.App.4th 130, 143.)

Plaintiff’s Motion is timely. Plaintiff seeks to set aside the dismissal due to Plaintiff’s counsel’s mistake, inadvertence, surprise, or neglect. Specifically, Plaintiff’s counsel states that when this matter came before the Court for the scheduled non-jury trial, he mistakenly told the appearance attorney to dismiss the case instead of requesting a continuance. (Mot., Schwarz Decl.., ¶ 3.)

Based on the timely request to vacate supported by an attorney affidavit of fault, Plaintiff’s Motion to Vacate Dismissal is GRANTED.

III. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club’s Motion for Order Vacating Entry of Dismissal is GRANTED. THE DISMISSAL ENTERED ON AUGUST 15, 2019 IS HEREBY VACATED.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.