This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/02/2020 at 18:56:43 (UTC).

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB VS ANDRE SPRINGER, SR., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/07/2018 INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANDRE SPRINGER, SR . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7977

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERINSURANCE EXCHANGE OF THE AUTO CLUB

Defendants

SPRINGER ANDRE LENELL JR.

SPRINGER ANDRE SR.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MENDELSON LEE MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Default Judgment - Default Judgment

1/13/2020: Default Judgment - Default Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/10/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 585 & 1033

12/10/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: 585 & 1033

Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment - Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment

9/20/2019: Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment - Motion to Set Aside/Vacate Default and / or Default Judgment

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

9/23/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

12/5/2019: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Notice of Change of Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name

12/5/2019: Notice of Change of Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/12/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - of Non Service

8/24/2018: Declaration (name extension) - of Non Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/28/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration (name extension) - of non service

8/15/2018: Declaration (name extension) - of non service

Proof of Personal Service

6/27/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Complaint

6/7/2018: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/7/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/7/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club against Defendant Andre Lenell Springer Jr. on the Complaint filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club on 06/07/2018 for damages of $10,930.43 and costs of $462.00 for a total of $11,392.43.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff); As to: Andre Lenell Springer, Jr. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment/dismissal scheduled for 06/04/2020 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment/dismissal scheduled for 06/04/2020 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/10/2021 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 12/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff); As to: Andre Lenell Springer, Jr. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Re: 585 & 1033; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to Andre Lenell Springer, Jr. On the Complaint filed by Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club on 06/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of non service; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff); As to: Andre Lenell Springer, Jr. (Defendant); Service Date: 06/24/18; Service Cost: 92.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff); As to: Andre Springer, Sr. (Defendant); Service Date: 06/24/18; Service Cost: 92.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff); As to: Andre Springer, Sr. (Defendant); Andre Lenell Springer, Jr. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Interinsurance Exchange of the Auto Club (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/05/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC07977    Hearing Date: December 05, 2019    Dept: 94

MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT

(CCP §§ 473(d), 473.5)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Andre Springer, Sr.’s Motion to Vacate Default is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

SUMMARY OF COMPLAINT: Action for automobile subrogation.

RELIEF REQUESTED: Vacate default against Defendant on the grounds he was not at home and did not get the mail. Defendant did not receive actual notice of this action until it showed up on a credit monitoring application in May 2019.

OPPOSITION: The motion should be read as if brought pursuant to CCP section 473(b), but Defendant has not demonstrated any surprise, mistake, inadvertence or excusable neglect.

REPLY: None filed as of December 2, 2019.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff Interinsurance Exchange of the Automobile Club (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for automobile subrogation against Defendant Andre Springer, Sr. (“Defendant Springer, Sr.”) and Andre Lenell Springer, Jr. (“Defendant Springer, Jr.”) on June 7, 2018. Following Defendants’ failure to file a responsive pleading, the court entered their default on December 12, 2018. Defendant Springer, Sr. filed the instant Motion to Vacate Default on September 20, 2019. Plaintiff filed its Opposition on October 23, 2019 and Defendant Springer, Sr. replied on November 22, 2019. On November 25, 2019, Plaintiff dismissed Defendant Springer, Sr. from the action.

Based on the foregoing, the hearing on Defendant Andre Springer, Sr.’s Motion to Vacate Default is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

Court clerk to give notice.