This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 01:34:49 (UTC).

INTERCOMMUNITY CARE CENTERS INC VS SMITH, KAREN

Case Summary

On 10/15/2015 INTERCOMMUNITY CARE CENTERS INC filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against SMITH, KAREN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2883

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

INTERCOMMUNITY CARE CENTERS INC

INTERCOMMUNITY CARE CENTERS INC DBA INTERCOMMUNITY CARE CENTER

Defendants

SMITH KAREN

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HOOPER LUNDY & BOOKMAN PC

Defendant Attorneys

KAMALA D HARRIS/MATTHEW I LAHANA

LAHANA KAMALA D HARRIS/MATTHEW I

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2016
  • DocketHEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2016
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • DocketAMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO THE CALIFORNIA DEPT OF PUBLIC HEALTH FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 04/17/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77 * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2015
  • DocketOSC SET 10/15/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • DocketOTHER WRIT - JUDICIAL REVIEW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERCOMMUNITY CARE CENTER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer INGLES MATTHEW

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARRIS KAMALA D. ESQ.