This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 00:38:50 (UTC).

INTERCOMMUNITY CARE CENTERS, INC. VS CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC

Case Summary

On 04/14/2015 INTERCOMMUNITY CARE CENTERS, INC filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4432

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

INTERCOMMUNITY CARE CENTERS INC.

INTERCOMMUNITY CARE CENTERS INC. DBA INTERCOMMUNITY CARE CENTER

Defendants

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC

SMITH M.D. KAREN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HOOPER, LUNDY & BOOKMAN, P.C.

HOOPER LUNDY & BOOKMAN P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

KAMALA D HARRIS/PHILLIP J MATSUMOTO

MATSUMOTO KAMALA D HARRIS/PHILLIP J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2016
  • DocketHEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2016
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2016
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE. NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE CASE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2015
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED - GENERAL DENIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2015
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 10/14/16, 00:00 AM, DEPT 77 * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - ASBESTOS Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2015
  • DocketOSC SET 04/16/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERCOMMUNITY CARE CENTER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARRIS KAMALA D. ESQ.