This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/20/2016 at 04:27:19 (UTC).

INSURANCE OFFICE OF AMERICA VS. DONEL INVESTMENTS. LLC

Case Summary

On 06/09/2014 INSURANCE OFFICE OF AMERICA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DONEL INVESTMENTS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4230

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INSURANCE OFFICE OF AMERICA DBA IOA INSURANCE SERVICES

Defendant

DONEL INVESTMENTS. LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2016
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2016
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 01/11/16 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2014
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT{S} AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION{S}.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING RECEIVED FROM (INSURANCE OFFICE OF AMERICA) DBA (IOA INSURANCE SERVICES) . CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT. SW8 FOR CONSIDERATION . RECEIPT # ING501316006

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO SW8 RE: REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2014
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 09/02/14 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. SW8 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1140609E1670. HEARING SET FOR 08/13/14 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. SW8.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2014
  • FICTITIOUS BUSINESS NAME DECLARATION ELECTRONICALLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Insurance Office of America, Inc. a Florida Corporation doing business as IOA Insurance Services is a litigant

Latest cases where DONEL INVESTMENTS LLC is a litigant