This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/08/2020 at 12:52:49 (UTC).

INGLEWOOD CROSSROADS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. VS PAMELA DAVIS

Case Summary

On 04/24/2020 INGLEWOOD CROSSROADS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PAMELA DAVIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3608

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INGLEWOOD CROSSROADS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC.

Defendant

DAVIS PAMELA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WATSON JOSEPH C.

 

Court Documents

Judgment - Judgment Proposed

7/29/2020: Judgment - Judgment Proposed

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/29/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration CCP 585 & Brief Summary

7/6/2020: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration CCP 585 & Brief Summary

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/6/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/24/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [First Amended Standing Order, Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case]

5/14/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [First Amended Standing Order, Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case]

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/30/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

4/24/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/24/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Inglewood Crossroads Homeowners Association, inc. against Defendant Pamela Davis on the Complaint filed by Inglewood Crossroads Homeowners Association, inc. on 04/24/2020 for damages of $7,526.53 and costs of $291.75 for a total of $7,818.28.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketJudgment Proposed; Filed by: Inglewood Crossroads Homeowners Association, inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Pamela Davis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment Proposed: Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment Proposed: Result Date changed from 07/17/2020 to 07/29/2020; As To Parties changed from Pamela Davis (Defendant) to Pamela Davis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment Proposed: Filed By: Inglewood Crossroads Homeowners Association, inc. (Plaintiff); Result changed from Entered to Granted; Result Date: 07/17/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDeclaration CCP 585 & Brief Summary; Filed by: Inglewood Crossroads Homeowners Association, inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Inglewood Crossroads Homeowners Association, inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Pamela Davis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketDefault entered as to Pamela Davis; On the Complaint filed by Inglewood Crossroads Homeowners Association, inc. on 04/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/28/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Inglewood Crossroads Homeowners Association, inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Pamela Davis (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 04/29/2020; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Inglewood Crossroads Homeowners Association, inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Pamela Davis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Inglewood Crossroads Homeowners Association, inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Pamela Davis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Inglewood Crossroads Homeowners Association, inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Pamela Davis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Inglewood Crossroads Homeowners Association, inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Pamela Davis (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INGLEWOOD CROSSROADS HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATIONS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WATSON JOSEPH C.