This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/28/2021 at 16:30:39 (UTC).

INGARDIA BROS. PRODUCE, INC. VS OOH LA LA CATERING, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 INGARDIA BROS PRODUCE, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against OOH LA LA CATERING, LLC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7043

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INGARDIA BROS. PRODUCE INC.

Defendants

OOH LA LA CATERING LLC

MCCRARY KYNDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEMIS GARY A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Ingardia Bros. Produce, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Ooh La La Catering, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs After Judgment, Acknowledgment of Credit, and Declaration of Accrued Interest; Filed by: Ingardia Bros. Produce, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Ooh La La Catering, LLC (Defendant); Costs: 10.00; Interest: 1299.56; Credits: 0.00; Service Date: 05/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Ingardia Bros. Produce, Inc. against Defendant Ooh La La Catering, LLC and Defendant Kyndra McCrary on the Complaint filed by Ingardia Bros. Produce, Inc. on 08/19/2020 for damages of $19,205.16, attorney fees of $996.15, costs of $490.25, and other $1,683.20 for a total of $22,374.76.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: Ingardia Bros. Produce, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Ooh La La Catering, LLC (Defendant); Kyndra McCrary (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Result Date changed from 10/19/2020 to 10/27/2020; As To Parties changed from Ooh La La Catering, LLC (Defendant), Kyndra McCrary (Defendant) to Ooh La La Catering, LLC (Defendant), Kyndra McCrary (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/27/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/27/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Default Judgment: Filed By: Ingardia Bros. Produce, Inc. (Plaintiff); Result changed from Entered to Granted; Result Date: 10/19/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Ingardia Bros. Produce, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Ingardia Bros. Produce, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Kyndra McCrary (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/28/2020; Service Cost: 56.75; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Kyndra McCrary (Defendant); As to: Ooh La La Catering, LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/24/2020; Service Cost: 63.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ingardia Bros. Produce, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Ooh La La Catering, LLC (Defendant); Kyndra McCrary (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ingardia Bros. Produce, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Ooh La La Catering, LLC (Defendant); Kyndra McCrary (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Ingardia Bros. Produce, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Ooh La La Catering, LLC (Defendant); Kyndra McCrary (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less