This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/16/2021 at 05:09:22 (UTC).

INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY VS JAMES SALDANA

Case Summary

On 04/02/2020 INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JAMES SALDANA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2962

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

SALDANA JAMES

SALDANA JAIME

LUNA JOSEPHINA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARK BROOKE Y.

Defendant Attorney

HILL GEOFFREY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/2/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/2/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/2/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/2/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

4/2/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/14/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

5/7/2020: Answer - Answer

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/7/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES

6/3/2021: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/5/2021: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/1/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

4/1/2021: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Notice of Change of Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name

11/2/2020: Notice of Change of Firm Name - Notice of Change of Firm Name

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2023
  • Hearing04/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • Hearing05/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketStipulation and Order TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES; Signed and Filed by: INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: JAMES SALDANA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketPursuant to written stipulation, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Continued - Stipulation was rescheduled to 05/26/2022 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: JAIME SALDANA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: JOSEPHINA LUNA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Change of Firm Name; Filed by: INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); New Firm Name: LAW OFFICES OF THOMAS D. POKLADOWSKI & ASSOCIATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Brooke Y. Park (Attorney): Organization Name changed from LAW OFFICES OF FRANCINE B. KELLY & ASSOCIATES to LAW OFFICES OF THOMAS D. POKLADOWSKI & ASSOCIATES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: JAMES SALDANA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Posting of Jury Fees; Filed by: JAMES SALDANA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: JAMES SALDANA (Defendant); Service Date: 04/10/2020; Service Cost: 111.70; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/30/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: JAMES SALDANA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: JAMES SALDANA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY (Plaintiff); As to: JAMES SALDANA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARK BROOKE Y.