Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/23/2019 at 01:15:14 (UTC).

INFINITY DATA NETWORKS INC. VS MITCHELL OIFOH, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/12/2018 INFINITY DATA NETWORKS INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MITCHELL OIFOH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3838

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INFINITY DATA NETWORKS INC. DBA INFINITY GENERAL CONTRACTORS GROUP

Defendants

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

OIFOH MITCHELL

OIFOH ADRIANE KOVAR

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

DANG VIVY D.

HALL HOWARD DORSEY

ABOLIAN DALAR

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/6/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Notice (name extension) - Notice Withdrawal of Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens)

2/6/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice Withdrawal of Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens)

Substitution of Attorney

8/17/2018: Substitution of Attorney

Summons - on Complaint

3/12/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/26/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Answer

4/20/2018: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/18/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Lis Pendens

4/10/2018: Notice of Lis Pendens

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/15/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Answer

4/26/2018: Answer

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/12/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/09/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Infinity Data Networks Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Mitchell Oifoh (Defendant); Adriane Kovar Oifoh (Defendant); Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketNotice Withdrawal of Notice of Pendency of Action (Lis Pendens); Filed by: Infinity Data Networks Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Mitchell Oifoh (Defendant); Adriane Kovar Oifoh (Defendant); Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Infinity Data Networks Inc. on 03/12/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Infinity Data Networks Inc. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 94 - Hon. James E. Blancarte; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Howard Dorsey Hall (Attorney); As to: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Mitchell Oifoh (Defendant); Adriane Kovar Oifoh (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Infinity Data Networks Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 03/27/2018; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: Infinity Data Networks Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Infinity Data Networks Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Mitchell Oifoh (Defendant); Service Date: 03/26/2018; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Infinity Data Networks Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Mitchell Oifoh (Defendant); Adriane Kovar Oifoh (Defendant); Nationstar Mortgage LLC (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Infinity Data Networks Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/09/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INFINITY DATA NETWORKS INC. DBA INFINITY GENERAL CONTRACTORS GROUP A CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dang, Vivy