This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/22/2019 at 12:15:50 (UTC).

INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA VS NBGI HOMES LLC

Case Summary

On 06/20/2017 INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NBGI HOMES LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7800

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA

CITY OF LOS ANGELES

STANDARD PORTFOLIO-OLYM BLVD

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

NBGI HOMES LLC

CHONG NANCY

CHONG JAE WOONG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF HAUSMAN & SOSA LLP

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

KIM MITCHELL S

Cross Defendant Attorney

LIN HSIU-CHUAN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/2/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/2/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration re: Due Diligence

8/2/2017: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Cross-Complaint

8/18/2017: Cross-Complaint

Summons - Cross-Complaint

8/18/2017: Summons - Cross-Complaint

Answer

8/18/2017: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/5/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Judicial Notice

9/20/2017: Request for Judicial Notice

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

9/20/2017: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Declaration (name extension)

9/20/2017: Declaration (name extension)

Affidavit (name extension) - of Reasonable Diligence

9/28/2017: Affidavit (name extension) - of Reasonable Diligence

Answer

9/29/2017: Answer

Opposition (name extension)

10/12/2017: Opposition (name extension)

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

10/24/2017: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Minute Order - (Hearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike)

10/26/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike)

Minute Order - (Amended)

10/26/2017: Minute Order - (Amended)

Notice of Ruling - Re: Hearing on Indemnity Company of California's Demurrer to Cross-Complaint by Jae Woong Chong

10/27/2017: Notice of Ruling - Re: Hearing on Indemnity Company of California's Demurrer to Cross-Complaint by Jae Woong Chong

Proof of Personal Service

11/1/2017: Proof of Personal Service

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: JAE WOONG CHONG (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketOn the Cross-Complaint filed by JAE WOONG CHONG on 08/18/2017, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by JAE WOONG CHONG as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/27/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/13/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 09/27/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by: JAE WOONG CHONG (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketOrder Granting Defendant/Cross-Complainant JAe Woong Chong's Motion for Sanctions against cross-defendant; Filed by: JAE WOONG CHONG (Cross-Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketStipulation and Order to use Certified Shorthand Reporter; Filed by: INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion - Other for Sanctions)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • DocketHearing on Motion - Other for Sanctions scheduled for 08/27/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 08/27/2018; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: JAE WOONG CHONG (Cross-Complainant); As to: INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA (Cross-Defendant); Standard Portfolio-Olym Blvd (Cross-Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: JAE WOONG CHONG (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2017
  • DocketSummons Cross-Complaint; Filed by:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff); As to: NBGI HOMES LLC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/05/2017; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff); As to: JAE WOONG CHONG (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/05/2017; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketDeclaration re: Due Diligence; Filed by: INDEMNITY COMPANY OF CALIFORNIA (Plaintiff); As to: NANCY CHONG (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 12/27/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketOSC SET 06/22/20, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - BREACH OF CONTRACT Filing Fee: 225.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less