This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/02/2020 at 06:39:38 (UTC).

INCOME ESTATES, LLC VS MIGUEL VALDEZ, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/25/2019 INCOME ESTATES, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MIGUEL VALDEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ASHFAQ G. CHOWDHURY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0859

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ASHFAQ G. CHOWDHURY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INCOME ESTATES LLC

Defendants

ZEPEDA FERNANDA AKA MARIA ZEPEDA

VALDEZ MIGUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRASNEY ROBERT ALAN

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

6/25/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/25/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

6/25/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/25/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/25/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Miguel Valdez)

6/26/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Miguel Valdez)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Fernanda Zepeda)

6/26/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Fernanda Zepeda)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

6/26/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

7/11/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/11/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

7/11/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/11/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale - Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

7/11/2019: Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale - Application for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

7/11/2019: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

7/15/2019: Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

8/2/2019: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Wholly Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Issued by: Income Estates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Miguel Valdez (Defendant); Fernanda Zepeda (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Income Estates, LLC (Plaintiff); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/27/2019; Service Cost: 25.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Income Estates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Miguel Valdez (Defendant); Service Date: 06/27/2019; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Income Estates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Miguel Valdez (Defendant); Fernanda Zepeda (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Income Estates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Miguel Valdez (Defendant); Fernanda Zepeda (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Income Estates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Fernanda Zepeda (Defendant); Service Date: 06/27/2019; Service Cost: 25.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketApplication for Issuance of Writ of Execution, Possession or Sale; Filed by: Income Estates, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to Miguel Valdez; Fernanda Zepeda; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by Income Estates, LLC on 06/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Income Estates, LLC against Defendant Miguel Valdez and Defendant Fernanda Zepeda AKA Maria Zepeda on the Complaint filed by Income Estates, LLC on 06/25/2019 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 6150 E. Avenue T Spc. 40, Palmdale, CA 93552 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 06/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Income Estates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Miguel Valdez (Defendant); Fernanda Zepeda (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Income Estates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Miguel Valdez (Defendant); Fernanda Zepeda (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Income Estates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Miguel Valdez (Defendant); Fernanda Zepeda (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 09/04/2019 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ashfaq G. Chowdhury in Department A22 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INCOME ESTATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRASNEY ROBERT ALAN