Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 06:11:34 (UTC).

INCOME ESTATES, LLC VS LEONOR PELAYO

Case Summary

On 05/17/2018 INCOME ESTATES, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against LEONOR PELAYO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ASHFAQ G. CHOWDHURY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0795

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ASHFAQ G. CHOWDHURY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INCOME ESTATES LLC

Defendant

PELAYO LEONOR

Palmdale, CA 93552

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHANA HARMEET KAUR

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return

9/4/2018: Writ - Return

Application for Writ of Possession

7/12/2018: Application for Writ of Possession

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/12/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

7/12/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/12/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

8/13/2018: Writ of Execution - (Los Angeles)

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

7/12/2018: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Summons - on Complaint

5/17/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/17/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

5/17/2018: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/17/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

5/17/2018: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Lenor Pelayo)

5/18/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Lenor Pelayo)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

5/18/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Wholly Satisfied); Non-Party; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution (Los Angeles): Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 09/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/14/2018 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Leonor Pelayo (Defendant): First Name changed from Lenor to Leonor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • Docket** Case Name changed from INCOME ESTATES, LLC vs LENOR PELAYO to INCOME ESTATES, LLC vs LEONOR PELAYO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 11/14/2018 08:30 AM at Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Income Estates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Leonor Pelayo (Defendant); Service Date: 06/15/2018; Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Income Estates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Leonor Pelayo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketDefault entered as to Leonor Pelayo; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by Income Estates, LLC on 05/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Income Estates, LLC (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 18.33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Income Estates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Proof of Mailing Date: 06/15/2018; Service Cost: 25.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 05/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Income Estates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Lenor Pelayo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Income Estates, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ashfaq G. Chowdhury in Department A22 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/30/2018 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INCOME ESTATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANA LAW FIRM - HARMEET K CHANA