Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/18/2020 at 00:01:14 (UTC).

INCOME ESTATES, LLC VS EVELIA LIMON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 INCOME ESTATES, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against EVELIA LIMON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANTY MORENO PETERS. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2477

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANTY MORENO PETERS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INCOME ESTATES LLC

Defendants

ROJAS JAVIER TAFOLLA

LIMON EVELIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRASNEY ROBERT A.

 

Court Documents

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/2/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/2/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

12/2/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Complaint - Complaint

12/2/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/2/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

12/3/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Javier Tafolla Rojas)

12/3/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Javier Tafolla Rojas)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Evelia Limon)

12/3/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Evelia Limon)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/27/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/27/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

12/27/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/27/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

12/27/2019: Writ of (name extension) - Writ of Possession

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

12/30/2019: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

12/30/2019: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer - Default Judgment By Clerk - Before Trial - 12/30/2019 entered for Plaintiff Income Estates, LLC against Defendant Javier Tafolla Rojas; Defendant Evelia Limon. Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Income Estates, LLC (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 32.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Income Estates, LLC against Defendant Javier Tafolla Rojas and Defendant Evelia Limon on the Complaint filed by Income Estates, LLC on 12/02/2019 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 1096 E Mission Blvd Apt 2, Pomona, CA 91766 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Income Estates, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Income Estates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Javier Tafolla Rojas (Defendant); Service Date: 12/15/2019; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Income Estates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Evelia Limon (Defendant); Javier Tafolla Rojas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Issued by: Income Estates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Evelia Limon (Defendant); Javier Tafolla Rojas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Income Estates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Proof of Mailing Date: 12/15/2019; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to Evelia Limon; Javier Tafolla Rojas; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by Income Estates, LLC on 12/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Income Estates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Evelia Limon (Defendant); Service Date: 12/15/2019; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 12/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Income Estates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Evelia Limon (Defendant); Javier Tafolla Rojas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Income Estates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Evelia Limon (Defendant); Javier Tafolla Rojas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Income Estates, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Evelia Limon (Defendant); Javier Tafolla Rojas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/10/2020 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Anthony Moreno Peters in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INCOME ESTATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRASNEY ROBERT ALAN