This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/17/2020 at 09:24:05 (UTC).

INCOME ESTATES LLC VS ARGUETA CRUZ

Case Summary

On 08/07/2019 INCOME ESTATES LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ARGUETA CRUZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT A. MCSORLEY. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1122

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT A. MCSORLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INCOME ESTATES LLC

Defendant

CRUZ ARGUETA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRASNEY ROBERT A

 

Court Documents

Writ - Return - Writ - Return

9/27/2019: Writ - Return - Writ - Return

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/7/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/7/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

8/7/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/7/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

8/7/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Argueta Cruz)

8/8/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (Argueta Cruz)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

8/8/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/3/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

9/3/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

9/6/2019: Application for Writ of Possession - Application for Writ of Possession

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/6/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

9/6/2019: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer - Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

9/6/2019: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Execution: Filed By: Income Estates LLC (Plaintiff); Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 09/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Wholly Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketDefault entered as to Argueta Cruz; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by Income Estates LLC on 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution; Issued by: Income Estates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Argueta Cruz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Clerk entered for Plaintiff Income Estates LLC against Defendant Argueta Cruz on the Complaint filed by Income Estates LLC on 08/07/2019 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 6150 E. Avenue T #55, Palmdale, CA 93552 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Income Estates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Argueta Cruz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Income Estates LLC (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 18.33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Income Estates LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 09/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Income Estates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Argueta Cruz (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/20/2019; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Income Estates LLC (Plaintiff); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/20/2019; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 08/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Income Estates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Argueta Cruz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Income Estates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Argueta Cruz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Income Estates LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Argueta Cruz (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert A. McSorley in Department A22 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INCOME ESTATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRASNEY ROBERT ALAN