This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/28/2020 at 10:28:19 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: UPSTREAM CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/23/2019 IN THE MATTER OF UPSTREAM CAPITAL INVESTMENTS, LLC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6781

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UPSTREAM CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

WEISER SECURITY SERVICES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

YEARGIN COLE

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/27/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

11/27/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/4/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/4/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

7/23/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/23/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

7/23/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/26/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/02/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • DocketAddress for Cole Yeargin (Attorney) updated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Upstream Capital Investments, LLC on 07/23/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Upstream Capital Investments, LLC as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Upstream Capital Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Weiser Security Services Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Upstream Capital Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Weiser Security Services Inc (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Upstream Capital Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Upstream Capital Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Weiser Security Services Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Upstream Capital Investments, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Weiser Security Services Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WEISER SECURITY SERVICES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where UPSTREAM CAPITAL INVESTMENTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YEARGIN COLE