This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/03/2021 at 00:52:33 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: SANDI LOZANO

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 IN THE MATTER OF SANDI LOZANO was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3916

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LOZANO SANDI

Claimant

LEON PIERO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CHANG DANICA Y.

 

Court Documents

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Piero

3/3/2021: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Piero

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition TO APPROVE COMPROMISE DISPUTED CLAIM)

4/1/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition TO APPROVE COMPROMISE DISPUTED CLAIM)

Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgm

4/1/2021: Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgme - Order Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgm

Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account - Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

4/1/2021: Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account - Order to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account

Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing - Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing

12/8/2020: Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing - Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Piero

12/8/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Piero

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

11/25/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition (name extension) - Petition TO APPROVE COMPROMISE DISPUTED CLAIM

11/25/2020: Petition (name extension) - Petition TO APPROVE COMPROMISE DISPUTED CLAIM

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/25/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

11/25/2020: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketOrder Approving Compromise of Disputed Claim or Pending Action or Disposition of Proceeds of Judgment for Minor or Person With a Disability (Miscellaneous); Signed and Filed by: Piero Leon (Claimant); As to: Sandi Lozano (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Deposit Money Into Blocked Account; Signed and Filed by: Piero Leon (Claimant); As to: Sandi Lozano (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition TO APPROVE COMPROMISE DISPUTED CLAIM)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketHearing on Petition TO APPROVE COMPROMISE DISPUTED CLAIM scheduled for 04/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 04/01/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Piero: Filed By: Sandi Lozano (Petitioner); Result: Granted; Result Date: 03/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Piero: Status Date changed from 03/01/2021 to 03/03/2021; Result Date changed from 03/03/2021 to 03/03/2021; As To Parties changed from Piero Leon (Claimant) to Piero Leon (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Piero; Signed and Filed by: Sandi Lozano (Petitioner); As to: Piero Leon (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing: Status Date changed from 12/07/2020 to 12/08/2020; As To Parties: removed; Status changed from Rejected to Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketApplication And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Piero; Filed by: Sandi Lozano (Petitioner); As to: Piero Leon (Claimant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketPetition TO APPROVE COMPROMISE DISPUTED CLAIM; Filed by: Sandi Lozano (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Sandi Lozano (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition TO APPROVE COMPROMISE DISPUTED CLAIM scheduled for 04/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STCP03916    Hearing Date: April 1, 2021    Dept: 26

In Re Matter of Piero Leon, et al.

PETITION TO APPROVE COMPROMISE OF PENDING ACTION

(Prob. Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; CCP § 372)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petition of Sandi Lozano, on behalf of minor Piero Lozano Compromise of Claim on behalf of minor Piero Leon is GRANTED.

TENTATIVE RULING:

On November 25, 2020, Petitioner Sandi Lozano (“Petitioner”), on behalf of minor Piero Leon (“Minor Leon”), filed the instant Petition to Approve Compromise of Pending Claim. On March 3, 2021, the Court granted Petitioner’s application to be appointed Minor Leon’s guardian ad litem. To date, no opposition has been filed.

Court approval is required for all settlements of a minor’s claim. (See Prob. Code §§ 3500, 3600, et seq.; Code Civ. Proc., § 372.) “[A] minor, a person who lacks legal capacity to make decisions, . . . shall appear either by a guardian or conservator of the estate or by a guardian ad litem appointed by the court in which the action or proceeding is pending, or by a judge thereof, in each case.” (Code Civ. Proc., § 372, emphasis added.)

Having reviewed the Petition, the Court finds it is complete and provides for a reasonable settlement to minor Leon based the injuries sustained and future prognosis. Proposed orders have been filed concurrently. Therefore, the Petition to Approve Minor’s Compromise of Disputed Claim is GRANTED.

Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHANG DANICA YA-HUI