This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/30/2020 at 01:57:09 (UTC).

IN THE MATTER OF: HELEN E. ANDREOLI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/08/2019 IN THE MATTER OF HELEN E ANDREOLI was filed as an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3390

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Petitioners

ANDREOLI HELEN E.

TENNEY STEVEN E.

POWERS JOSEPH W.

PIPER JOHN M.

Defendants

RUSSELL REBECCA AKA JESSICA RUSSELL

RUSSELL REBECCA

Respondent

UBS FINANCIAL SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

KIMBALL JULIE Z.

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Scheduled Hearing

9/30/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Scheduled Hearing

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: filing and service of an Amended Pet...)

9/28/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: filing and service of an Amended Pet...)

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continuance of Hearing

4/17/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Continuance of Hearing

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/9/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Summons - Summons on Petition

3/13/2020: Summons - Summons on Petition

Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint

3/13/2020: Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/11/2019: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort - Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

1/9/2020: Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort - Notice of Rejection - Application for Default Judgment by Court - Contract or Tort

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

10/2/2019: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

10/3/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

8/28/2019: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

8/29/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint) - Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

8/8/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Petition

8/8/2019: Summons - Summons on Petition

Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

8/8/2019: Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award - Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/8/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/8/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

8/8/2019: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2020
  • Hearing12/07/2020 at 09:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • Hearing12/07/2020 at 09:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award: Filed By: Steven E. Tenney (Petitioner),Helen E. Andreoli (Petitioner),John M. Piper (Petitioner),Joseph W. Powers (Petitioner); Result: Granted in Part; Result Date: 10/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketStatus Conference re Rebecca Russell scheduled for 12/07/2020 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketNon-Appearance Case Review re lodging of proposed judgment as to defendant USB Financial Services scheduled for 12/07/2020 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 10/28/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 10/28/2020; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketNotice Notice of Scheduled Hearing; Filed by: Steven E. Tenney (Petitioner); Joseph W. Powers (Petitioner); John M. Piper (Petitioner); Helen E. Andreoli (Petitioner); As to: Rebecca Russell (Defendant); UBS Financial Services, Inc. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 10/28/2020 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: filing and service of an Amended Pet...)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: Helen E. Andreoli (Petitioner); John M. Piper (Petitioner); Joseph W. Powers (Petitioner); Steven E. Tenney (Petitioner); As to: Rebecca Russell (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Helen E. Andreoli (Petitioner); John M. Piper (Petitioner); Joseph W. Powers (Petitioner); Steven E. Tenney (Petitioner); As to: Rebecca Russell (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketHearing on Petition Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award scheduled for 12/12/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketSummons on Petition; Issued and Filed by: Helen E. Andreoli (Petitioner); John M. Piper (Petitioner); As to: Joseph W. Powers (Petitioner); Steven E. Tenney (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Helen E. Andreoli (Petitioner); John M. Piper (Petitioner); Joseph W. Powers (Petitioner); Steven E. Tenney (Petitioner); As to: Joseph W. Powers (Petitioner); Steven E. Tenney (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • DocketPetition to Confirm Arbitration Award; Filed by: Helen E. Andreoli (Petitioner); John M. Piper (Petitioner); Joseph W. Powers (Petitioner); Steven E. Tenney (Petitioner); As to: Joseph W. Powers (Petitioner); Steven E. Tenney (Petitioner); Rebecca Russell (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STCP03390    Hearing Date: October 28, 2020    Dept: 26

In the Matter of: Helen E. Andreoli, et al.

PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

(CCP § 1285, et seq.)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Petitioners Helen E. Andreoli, John M. Piper, Joseph W. Powers, and Steven E. Tenney’s Amended Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award and Enter Judgment is GRANTED AS TO RESPONDENT USB FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. AND DENIED AS TO RESPONDENT REBECCA RUSSELL AKA JESSICA RUSSELL

ANALYSIS:

Petitioners Helen E. Andreoli, John M. Piper, Joseph W. Powers, and Steven E. Tenney (“Petitioners’) filed a Petition to Confirm an Arbitration Award (“the first Petition”) issued by the Financial Industry Regulatory Authority (“FINRA”) Office of Dispute Resolution served on February 12, 2019 (the “Award”). (Pet. Exh. A.) The initial Petition named Rebecca Russell aka Jessica Russell (“Respondent Russell”) as the sole Respondent. Following Respondent’s failure to file a responsive pleading, Petitioners obtained entry of default against Respondent.

On March 2, 2020, the Court denied the first Petition without prejudice to Petitioners filing an Amended Petition that included the other parties to the arbitration proceeding. Petitioners filed an Amended Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award against Respondent Russell and USB Financial Services, Inc. (“Respondent USB”) on March 13, 2020. On April 17, 2020, Respondent USB filed a notice of non-opposition. To date, Defendant Russell has not filed an opposition.

Legal Standard

“Regardless of the particular relief granted, any arbitrator's award is enforceable only when confirmed as a judgment of the superior court.” (O'Hare v. Municipal Resource Consultants (2003) 107 Cal.App.4th 267, 278.) “Once a petition to confirm an award is filed, the superior court must select one of only four courses of action: it may confirm the award, correct and confirm it, vacate it, or dismiss the petition.” (EHM Productions, Inc. v. Starline Tours of Hollywood, Inc. (2018) 21 Cal.App.5th 1058, 1063.) It is well settled that the scope of judicial review of arbitration awards is extremely narrow.” (California Faculty Assn. v. Superior Court (1998) 63 Cal.App.4th 935, 943.) “Neither the trial court, nor the appellate court, may ‘review the merits of the dispute, the sufficiency of the evidence, or the arbitrator's reasoning, nor may we correct or review an award because of an arbitrator's legal or factual error, even if it appears on the award's face. Instead, we restrict our review to whether the award should be vacated under the grounds listed in section 1286.2. [Citations.]’” (Id.)

Discussion

A. Filing Requirements of a Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award (CCP § 1285.4)

Code of Civil Procedure section 1285.4 states: “A petition under this chapter shall:

(a) Set forth the substance of or have attached a copy of the agreement to arbitrate unless the petitioner denies the existence of such an agreement.

(b) Set forth the names of the arbitrators.

(c) Set forth or have attached a copy of the award and the written opinion of the arbitrators, if any.”

(Code Civ. Proc., § 1285.4 (emphasis added).)

Petitioners have submitted a copy of the Arbitration Agreement, the name of the arbitrator, and a copy of the Arbitration Award (Pet., ¶¶2-4 and Attachment 4(c)). Therefore, the Court finds that Petitioners have satisfied Code of Civil Procedure section 1285.4, subdivisions (a)-(c).

B. Service of the Petition and Notice of Hearing (CCP § 1290.4)

Code of Civil Procedure section 1290.4 states in pertinent part:

“(a) A copy of the petition and a written notice of the time and place of the hearing thereof and any other papers upon which the petition is based shall be served in the manner provided in the arbitration agreement for the service of such petition and notice.

(b) If the arbitration agreement does not provide the manner in which such service shall be made and the person upon whom service is to be made has not previously appeared in the proceeding and has not previously been served in accordance with this subdivision: ¶ (1) Service within this State shall be made in the manner provided by law for the service of summons in an action.”

(Code Civ. Proc., § 1290.4.) On April 1, 2020, Petitioners filed a Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt from Respondent USB with respect to the Amended Petition. Petitioners filed a Notice of Hearing on Amended Petition demonstrating service of the notice of hearing on Respondent USB. (Notice of Hearing, filed 9/30/20.) However, there is no proof of service of the either the Amended Petition or Notice of Hearing on Respondent Russell. Therefore, the Court cannot find that Petitioner has satisfied Code of Civil Procedure section 1290.4 with respect to Respondent Russell.

C. Service of the Arbitration Award (CCP § 1283.6)

Code of Civil Procedure section 1283.6 provides that: “The neutral arbitrator shall serve a signed copy of the award on each party to the arbitration personally or by registered or certified mail or as provided in the agreement.”  (Emphasis added.) This requirement may be satisfied by service by the arbitration, or upon proper service of the Award with the Petition. (See Murry v. Civil Service Employees Ins. Co. (1967) 254 Cal.App.2d 796, 799-800.) The Award was served by the arbitrator on February 12, 2019, but the manner of service is not indicated. (Pet., Exh. 1.) However, as the Award was also served with the first and Amended Petitions, the Court finds Code of Civil Procedure section 1283.6 is satisfied.

D. Timing of Service of Petition (CCP §§ 1288, 1288.4)

Furthermore, a party may seek a court judgment confirming an arbitration award by filing and serving a petition no more than four years, but not less than 10 days, after the award is served. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 1288, 1288.4.) Petitioners have demonstrated that the first and Amended Petitions were served less than four years after service of the signed copy of the Award, thereby complying with Code of Civil Procedure section 1288. Proof of service of Award also demonstrates it was served prior to service of the Petition. Therefore, the Court finds Petitioners have complied with Code of Civil Procedure 1288.4.

E. Merits of the Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award

The court must confirm the award as made, unless it corrects or vacates the award, or dismisses the proceeding. (Code Civ. Proc., § 1286; Valsan Partners Limited Partnership v. Calcor Space Facility, Inc. (1994) 25 Cal.App.4th 809, 818.) Petitioners have submitted the nature of the Arbitration Agreement, name of the arbitrator, and a copy of the Arbitration Award (Amended Pet., ¶¶2-4 and Attachment 4(c)).

Conclusion

Petitioners Helen E. Andreoli, John M. Piper, Joseph W. Powers, and Steven E. Tenney’s Amended Petition to Confirm Arbitration Award and Enter Judgment is GRANTED AS TO RESPONDENT USB FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. AND DENIED AS TO RESPONDENT REBECCA RUSSELL AKA JESSICA RUSSELL.

Moving party is to give notice.

Case Number: 19STCP03390    Hearing Date: March 02, 2020    Dept: 26

In the Matter of: Helen E. Andreoli, et al.

MOTION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION AWARD

(CCP § 1285, et seq.)

TENTATIVE RULING:

The Petition is DENIED. Petitioners fail to satisfy Code of Civil Procedure sections 1285 and 1285.4(a).

The Court sets an OSC re filing and service of an Amended Petition for MAY 4, 2020 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

ANY AMENDED PETITION IS TO BE FILED ON JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA ADR-106 FORM, WHICH IS SPECIFICALLY CREATED FOR A PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD.

ANALYSIS:

I. Background

Petitioners Helen E. Andreoli, John M. Piper, Joseph W. Powers, and Steven E. Tenney filed this Petition to confirm an award from FINRA Office of Dispute Resolution served on February 12, 2019 (the “Award”). (Pet. Exh. A.) The Petition names Rebecca Russell aka Jessica Russell as the sole Respondent.

Petitioners are employees of UBS Financial Services, Inc. In the underlying arbitration, Jessica Russell commenced the proceeding against UBS, alleging UBS unsuitably recommended annuities and a credit line and otherwise failed to provide a financial plan. Petitioners were unnamed parties in the arbitration. The arbitration action against UBS settled. But, the proceeding the case remained open to allow Petitioners’ request for expungement (because FINRA rules require them to disclose the Arbitration on their FINRA records as the advisors who serviced Russell’s account, even though they were not named as parties to the Arbitration).

On October 3, 2019, the clerk entered default against Respondent Rebecca Russell aka Jessica Russell.

II. Legal Standard

Any party to an arbitration in which an award has been made may petition the court to confirm, correct, or vacate the award. (Code Civ. Proc., § 1285.) The petition shall name as respondents all parties to the arbitration and may name as respondents any other persons bound by the arbitration award. (Ibid.) The petition must be filed and served no less than ten days and no more than four years after the award is served on the party seeking confirmation. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 1288, 1288.4.)

The petition also must:

(a) Set forth the substance of or have attached a copy of the agreement to arbitrate unless the petitioner denies the existence of such an agreement.

(b) Set forth names of the arbitrators.

(c) Set forth or have attached a copy of the award and the written opinion of the arbitrators, if any.

(Code Civ. Proc., § 1285.4.)

If a petition is unopposed after being duly filed and served on a respondent, its allegations are deemed admitted. (Code Civ. Proc. § 1290.)

Until an arbitration award is confirmed or vacated, it has the same force and effect as a contract in writing between the parties to the arbitration. (Code Civ. Proc., § 1287.6.) If confirmed, judgment shall be entered in conformity with the award. (Code Civ. Proc., § 1287.4.) Such judgment has the same force and effect as, and is subject to all the provisions of law relating to a judgment in a civil action of the same jurisdictional classification. If the petition is duly served and filed, the court shall confirm the award as made, whether rendered in this state or another state. (Code Civ. Proc., § 1286.)

III. Analysis

While Petitioners contend the requirements of FINRA Rule 2080(a) have been satisfied, the applicable law is Code of Civil Procedure sections 1285, et seq. The requirements under California law must be satisfied to obtain an order confirming the subject Award.

1. Petition Does Not Name All Parties to the Arbitration

The named parties to the arbitration were Jessica Russell and UBS Financial Services, Inc. Petitioners Helen E. Andreoli, John M. Piper, Joseph W. Powers, and Steven E. Tenney were unnamed parties. (See Pet. Exh. A [Award] p. 2 [under “Other Issues Considered and Decided”].)

The Petition names the following parties: Petitioners Helen E. Andreoli, John M. Piper, Joseph W. Powers, Steven E. Tenney, and Respondent Rebecca Russell aka Jessica Russell.

Based on the foregoing, Petitioners were parties to the arbitration and thus may bring this Petition to confirm the Award. (Code Civ. Proc., § 1285.) However, the Petition does not name UBS Financial Services, Inc. as a party. Therefore, Petitioners do not satisfy section 1285. (Code Civ. Proc., § 1285 [“The petition shall name as respondents all parties to the arbitration and may name as respondents any other persons bound by the arbitration award.”].)

The Court notes Petitioners obtained FINRA’s permission to not name FINRA as a party in the judicial proceeding to confirm the arbitration award. (Pet. Exh. B.)

2. Petition is Timely

The Award was served on February 12, 2019. The Petition was filed on August 8, 2019. Thus, the Petition is timely filed because it was filed more than ten days and less than four years after the date the Award was served.

3. Copy of Agreement to Arbitrate is Not Attached

The Petition does not set forth the substance of or have attached a copy of the agreement to arbitrate or deny the existence of such an agreement. Thus, Petitioner do not satisfy section 1285.4(a).

4. The Arbitrators are Identified

The Petition identifies the arbitrators: Susan M. Thevenet, Ronald L. Cheney, and Peter L. Murray. (Pet. ¶ 24.) Therefore, Petitioners satisfy section 1285.4(b).

5. The Arbitrators’ Opinion and Award is Attached

The Petition attaches a copy of the award and the written opinion of the arbitrators. (Pet. Exh. A.) Therefore, Petitioners satisfy section 1285.4(c).

IV. Conclusion

For the stated reasons, the Petition is DENIED. Petitioners fail to satisfy Code of Civil Procedure sections 1285 and 1285.4(a).

The Court sets an OSC re filing and service of an Amended Petition for MAY 4, 2020 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

ANY AMENDED PETITION IS TO BE FILED ON JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA ADR-106 FORM, WHICH IS SPECIFICALLY CREATED FOR A PETITION TO CONFIRM CONTRACTUAL ARBITRATION AWARD.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

Parties may submit via e mail until Monday at 10 a.m.