Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2019 at 01:35:56 (UTC).

IKEH, UZOMA VS STARFLINGER, PETER

Case Summary

On 09/03/2015 IKEH, UZOMA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STARFLINGER, PETER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are JOSEPH BROWN and STEVEN L. BERMAN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6564

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

JOSEPH BROWN

STEVEN L. BERMAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IKEH UZOMA

Defendants

STAR MANAGEMENT

ORANGE HOLDING LLC

STARLINGER PETER

STARFLINGER PETER

R22 INC. WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CA AS STAR MANAGEMENT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (STARFLINGER, PETER) . MIDRED MALDONADO, EMPLOYEE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:01A M, IN DEPT. SW8 , HON. STEVEN L. BERMAN PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE AS TO (STARFLINGER, PETER) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 02/03/16 . FOR (IKEH, UZOMA) . AGAINST (ORANGE HOLDING, LLC) , (R22 INC.)WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CA AS (STAR MANAGEMENT) . PRINCIPAL $ 500.00 . COSTS $ 150.00 . TOTAL $ 650.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (ORANGE HOLDING, LLC) , (R22 INC.)WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CA AS (STAR MANAGEMENT) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM SW8 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED AS TO (IKEH, UZOMA) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (R22 INC.)WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CA AS (STAR MANAGEMENT) . MILDRED MALDONADO, LEASING MANAGER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 11:38A M, IN DEPT. SW8 , HON. JOSEPH BROWN, JUDGE PRO TEM PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 02/03/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SW8 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM SW8 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2015
  • REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE/POSTPONEMENT OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING RECEIVED FROM (STARFLINGER, PETER) . CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT. SW8 FOR CONSIDERATION . RECEIPT # ING478405003

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AS TO (STARFLINGER, PETER) FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/18/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT SW8 . SERVICE COSTS: $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AS TO (R22 INC.)WHICH WILL DO BUSINESS IN CA AS (STAR MANAGEMENT) FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/18/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT SW8 . SERVICE COSTS: $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AS TO (ORANGE HOLDING, LLC) FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S DEPARTMENT. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 11/18/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPARTMENT SW8 . SERVICE COSTS: $ 40.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2015
  • AMENDMENT TO CLAIM OF (IKEH, UZOMA) FILED ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # ING457579010 . HEARING SET FOR 11/18/15 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. SW8

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ORANGE HOLDINGS LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where STAR MANAGEMENT is a litigant