This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 02:13:58 (UTC).

IFFAT KARIM, ET AL. VS KATHERINE MARIE GURZI

Case Summary

On 09/19/2018 IFFAT KARIM filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KATHERINE MARIE GURZI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4771

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KARIM IFFAT

LARA KATHY

6067 Walnut Ave.

Long Beach, CA 90805

CHISTI ISHTIAQ

Long Beach, CA 90807

Defendant

GURZI KATHERINE MARIE

Long Beach, CA 90806

 

Court Documents

Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil) - Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

1/14/2019: Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil) - Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds - Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds

3/13/2019: Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds - Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds

Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court

11/21/2018: Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11/13/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

11/13/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/13/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Pay Judgment to Court]

11/21/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Pay Judgment to Court]

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

11/13/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

9/19/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds - Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds

12/20/2018: Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds - Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

9/19/2018: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

11/13/2018: Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Request to Pay Judgment to Court

11/21/2018: Request to Pay Judgment to Court - Request to Pay Judgment to Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/19/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/13/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

11/13/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/13/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketJudgment Creditor's Request for Funds; Filed by: Ishtiaq Chisti (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Satisfaction of Judgment on Request to Pay Judgment to Court: As To Parties: Katherine Marie Gurzi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 03/12/2019 ; Status Date changed from 01/09/2019 to 03/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 03/12/2019 ; Status Date changed from 01/09/2019 to 03/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Bellflower Courthouse in Department 1 - Hon. Carol Rose; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 01/09/2019 ; Status Date changed from 11/13/2018 to 01/09/2019 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 01/09/2019 ; Status Date changed from 11/13/2018 to 01/09/2019 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketJudgment Creditor's Request for Funds; Filed by: Ishtiaq Chisti (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • DocketRequest to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: Katherine Marie Gurzi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketReceipt for Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Iffat Karim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Ishtiaq Chisti against Defendant Katherine Marie Gurzi on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Iffat Karim, et al. on 09/19/2018 for the principal amount of $1,200.00 and costs of $50.00 for a total of $1,250.00.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Iffat Karim (Plaintiff); Kathy Lara (Plaintiff); As to: Katherine Marie Gurzi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.