Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/25/2021 at 00:47:17 (UTC).

IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY VS EDDIE PIPER, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/11/2019 IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EDDIE PIPER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6459

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Uninsured Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

IDS PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

MALACHI PIPAR

PIPER EDDIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MENDELSON LEE M

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Requests for Admissions to be Dee...)

3/23/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Requests for Admissions to be Dee...)

Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTIONFOR ORDER COMPELLING THAT THETRUTH OF MATTERS SPECIFIED INPLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTFOR ADMISSIONS BE DEEMEDADMIT

10/29/2020: Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTIONFOR ORDER COMPELLING THAT THETRUTH OF MATTERS SPECIFIED INPLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTFOR ADMISSIONS BE DEEMEDADMIT

Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTIONFOR ORDER COMPELLING THAT THETRUTH OF MATTERS SPECIFIED INPLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTFOR ADMISSIONS BE DEEMEDADMIT

10/29/2020: Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTIONFOR ORDER COMPELLING THAT THETRUTH OF MATTERS SPECIFIED INPLAINTIFF'S FIRST SET OF REQUESTFOR ADMISSIONS BE DEEMEDADMIT

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/21/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE NON-JURY TRIAL

12/21/2020: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE NON-JURY TRIAL

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

9/5/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

9/5/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Answer - Answer

8/14/2019: Answer - Answer

Answer - Answer

8/14/2019: Answer - Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/14/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

8/14/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

7/30/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/30/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

7/11/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

7/11/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/11/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7/11/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • Hearing07/14/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Hearing09/28/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Requests for Admissions to be Dee...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Requests for Admissions to be Deemed Admitted scheduled for 03/23/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 03/23/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Request for Admissions to be Deemed Admitted scheduled for 03/23/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 03/23/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE NON-JURY TRIAL; Filed by: IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Eddie Piper (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE NON-JURY TRIAL scheduled for 12/22/2020 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 09/28/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION TO CONTINUE NON-JURY TRIAL scheduled for 12/22/2020 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Pipar Malachi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Eddie Piper (Defendant); Service Date: 07/29/2019; Service Cost: 92.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Pipar Malachi (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/30/2019; Service Cost: 92.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 07/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Eddie Piper (Defendant); Pipar Malachi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Eddie Piper (Defendant); Pipar Malachi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company (Plaintiff); As to: Eddie Piper (Defendant); Pipar Malachi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC06459    Hearing Date: March 23, 2021    Dept: 26

IDS Property Casualty Ins. Co. v. Piper, et al.

MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED

(CCP § 2033.280)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company (1) Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted Against Defendant Eddie Piper; and (2) Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted Against Defendant Pipar Malachi are GRANTED. EACH DEFENDANT IS ORDERED TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $285.65 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 30 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for automobile subrogation against Defendants Eddie Piper (“Defendant Piper”) and Pipar Malachi (“Defendant Malachi”) on July 11, 2019. Defendants answered in pro se on August 14, 2019. On January 6, 2020, Plaintiff served Requests for Admissions on both Defendants. (Motions, Schwarz Decl., Exh. 1.) Despite meet and confer efforts, Plaintiff has not received any verified responses to the discovery requests from Defendants. (Id. at ¶¶4-5 and Exh. 2.) Plaintiff filed the instant Motions to Compel Responses to Requests for Admission and Request for Sanctions on October 29, 2020. To date, no opposition has been filed.

Defendants have not served verified responses to the discovery propounded on January 6, 2020 as of the filing of the Motions. There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer effort before a motion to deem requests for admission can be filed. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2033.280.) Further, the motion can be brought any time after the responding party fails to provide the responses. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2033.280.) Therefore, Plaintiff is entitled to an order deeming the Requests for Admission admitted. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2033.280.) Sanctions are required under Code of Civil Procedure sections 2023.010, 2023.030 and 2033.280, and have been properly noticed. However, the amount sought is excessive under a lodestar calculation. Sanctions are granted against each Defendant in the amount of $286.65, based on half-an-hour of attorney time billed at $450.00 per hour, plus the $61.65 filing fee. (Motions, Schwarz Decl., ¶5.)

Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company’s (1) Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted Against Defendant Eddie Piper; and (2) Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted Against Defendant Pipar Malachi are GRANTED. EACH DEFENDANT IS ORDERED TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $285.65 TO PLAINTIFF’S COUNSEL WITHIN 30 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MENDELSON LEE MICHAEL