This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/06/2017 at 07:36:47 (UTC).

ICON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC VS BROOKS, LORENZO

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 ICON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BROOKS, LORENZO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4519

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ICON PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

BROOKS LORENZO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANDELBAUM & ROBISON LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED: RETURNED BY ATTY SERVICE///IC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • JUDGMENT AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS - CCP 415.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION REJECTED-NO JUDGEMENT FOR UNNAMED TENANTS...

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • UNNAMED TENANTS REJECT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FOR THE UNNAMED TENANTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • DEFAULT AS TO THE UNNAMED TENANTS CCP 415.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • OSC SET 11/01/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT. CLK PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED - U.D. RESIDENTIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less