This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/06/2021 at 00:28:05 (UTC).

IAN WILLIAMS VS MARCUS BEVERLY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/22/2018 IAN WILLIAMS filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against MARCUS BEVERLY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANDREW E. COOPER. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0206

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANDREW E. COOPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS IAN

Defendants

BEVERLY MARCUS

BEVERLY MASAYO

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

2/26/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

3/1/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/1/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Writ - Return

9/12/2018: Writ - Return

Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

3/6/2018: Notice of Rejection - Post Judgment

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

3/6/2018: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

2/27/2018: Notice of Rejection - Pleadings

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

2/13/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

2/1/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Summons - on Complaint

1/22/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

1/23/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Masayo Beverly)

1/23/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Masayo Beverly)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Marcus Beverly)

1/23/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Marcus Beverly)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/22/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Case Destroyed pursuant to California Government Code Section 68151 and 68153.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Wholly Satisfied); Non-Party; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • DocketWrit of possession; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Ian Williams (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 80.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketDefault Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Post Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/02/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/06/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketDefault judgment entered for Plaintiff Ian Williams against Defendant Marcus Beverly and Defendant Masayo Beverly on the Complaint filed by Ian Williams on 01/22/2018 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is not granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 24585 Town Center Drive, Unit 4201, Valencia, CA 91355 is granted for plaintiff(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ian Williams (Plaintiff); As to: Masayo Beverly (Defendant); Service Date: 02/19/18; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Ian Williams (Plaintiff); As to: Marcus Beverly (Defendant); Masayo Beverly (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Entry of Default / Judgment: Status changed from Filed to Rejected

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Ian Williams (Plaintiff); As to: Marcus Beverly (Defendant); Service Date: 01/31/18; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 01/23/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Ian Williams (Plaintiff); As to: Marcus Beverly (Defendant); Masayo Beverly (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Ian Williams (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Andrew E. Cooper in Department F44 Chatsworth Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/02/2018 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less