Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/26/2018 at 10:02:36 (UTC).

I-ON GROUP INC. VS DAVIS CHRISTOPHER NEIL

Case Summary

On 07/12/2017 I-ON GROUP INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DAVIS CHRISTOPHER NEIL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANNABELLE G CORTEZ. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5358

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANNABELLE G CORTEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

I-ON GROUP INC.

Po Box 2474,

Riverside, CA 92516

Defendant

NEIL DAVIS CHRISTOPHER

Apple Valley, CA 92307

 

Court Documents

By Tse Hoi Cheung

9/1/2017: By Tse Hoi Cheung

Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/01/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

9/1/2017: Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/01/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Unknown

9/1/2017: Unknown

(Non-Jury Trial)

9/1/2017: (Non-Jury Trial)

Unknown

7/27/2017: Unknown

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/12/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff I-On Group Inc. against Defendant Davis Christopher Neil on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by I-On Group Inc. on 07/12/2017 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $2,590.00.; Other: WAIVED AMOUNT OVER $2500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By Tse Hoi Cheung; Filed by: I-On Group Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 09/01/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/01/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2 updated: Result Date to 09/01/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: I-On Group Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Davis Christopher Neil (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 07/24/17; Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: I-On Group Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Davis Christopher Neil (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0014986 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Annabelle G Cortez at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/01/2017 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where I-ON GROUP INC. is a litigant