Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2021 at 05:23:04 (UTC).

HYE SUN PARK VS COWAY USA, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/19/2020 HYE SUN PARK filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against COWAY USA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8803

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARK HYE SUN

Defendant

COWAY USA INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIM JAMIE

Defendant Attorney

SIPPRELLE KEITH ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer

11/16/2020: Answer - Answer

Complaint - Complaint

10/19/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/19/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

10/19/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/19/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/19/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/19/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2023
  • Hearing10/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • Hearing04/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Coway USA, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Hye Sun Park (Plaintiff); As to: Coway USA, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Hye Sun Park (Plaintiff); As to: Coway USA, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Hye Sun Park (Plaintiff); As to: Coway USA, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Hye Sun Park (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Hye Sun Park (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COWAY USA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM JAMIE