This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/05/2019 at 04:12:28 (UTC).

HUNTINGTON GLAZING, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS SOLPAC CONSTRUCTION, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/20/2019 HUNTINGTON GLAZING, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SOLPAC CONSTRUCTION, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7748

  • Filing Date:

    08/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HUNTINGTON GLAZING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY A MASSACHUSETTS CORPORATION

LONG BEACH CITY COLLEGE A PUBLIC ENTITY

SOLPAC CONSTRUCTION INC. DBA SOLTEK PACIFIC CONSTRUCTION COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARLTON ANDREW C

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

9/26/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/20/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

8/20/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/20/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/20/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

8/20/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/23/2022 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: HUNTINGTON GLAZING, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by HUNTINGTON GLAZING, INC., a California corporation on 08/20/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by HUNTINGTON GLAZING, INC., a California corporation as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/23/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: HUNTINGTON GLAZING, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: SOLPAC CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant); LONG BEACH CITY COLLEGE, a public entity (Defendant); LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Massachusetts corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: HUNTINGTON GLAZING, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: SOLPAC CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant); LONG BEACH CITY COLLEGE, a public entity (Defendant); LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Massachusetts corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: HUNTINGTON GLAZING, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: SOLPAC CONSTRUCTION, INC. (Defendant); LONG BEACH CITY COLLEGE, a public entity (Defendant); LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, a Massachusetts corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Solpac Construction, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where HUNTINGTON GLAZING INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where LONG BEACH CITY OF is a litigant

Latest cases where Liberty Mutual Insurance Company is a litigant