This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/23/2019 at 04:28:52 (UTC).

HUMBERTO RODRIGUEZ VS FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICE INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/08/2017 HUMBERTO RODRIGUEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICE INC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7623

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RODRIGUEZ HUMBERTO

Defendants

FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION

FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF THE SOUTHWEST INC.

FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS ONLINE AND LONG DISTANCE INC

FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICE INC

FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA INC

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/8/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

8/22/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

8/22/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

8/22/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

8/22/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

8/22/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

10/16/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 10/17/2017

10/17/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 10/17/2017

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

10/17/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

10/17/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

10/16/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Other - (name extension) - EXHIBITS RECEIPT

11/8/2017: Other - (name extension) - EXHIBITS RECEIPT

Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

12/29/2017: Notice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil)

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

2/9/2018: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 02/20/2018 ; Status Date changed from 10/17/2017 to 02/20/2018 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: HUMBERTO RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • DocketNotice of Intent to Dispose of Exhibits (Civil); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • DocketOther - EXHIBITS RECEIPT; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 10/17/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff HUMBERTO RODRIGUEZ against Defendant FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by HUMBERTO RODRIGUEZ on 08/08/2017 for the principal amount of $3,250.00 and costs of $225.00 for a total of $3,475.00.; Other: EXHIBITS TO CUSTODIAN.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by HUMBERTO RODRIGUEZ on 08/08/2017 as follows: Defendants FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA, INC; FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICE INC; FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS ONLINE AND LONG DISTANCE INC; FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF THE SOUTHWEST INC. do not owe the plaintiff HUMBERTO RODRIGUEZ any money on plaintiff's claim.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/16/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 10/16/2017; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: HUMBERTO RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS ONLINE AND LONG DISTANCE INC (Defendant); Service Cost: 150.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 08/15/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: HUMBERTO RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICE INC (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 08/15/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: HUMBERTO RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 08/15/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: HUMBERTO RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA, INC (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 08/15/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: HUMBERTO RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF THE SOUTHWEST INC. (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 08/15/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: HUMBERTO RODRIGUEZ (Plaintiff); As to: FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATE SERVICE INC (Defendant); FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS CORPORATION (Defendant); FRONTIER COMMUNICATIONS OF AMERICA, INC (Defendant) et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/16/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less