This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/18/2018 at 07:46:22 (UTC).

HULAC-WEST, LLC VS ROYAL DINING CATERING, INC

Case Summary

On 10/25/2017 HULAC-WEST, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROYAL DINING CATERING, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3562

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HULAC-WEST LLC

Defendants

ROYAL DINING CATERING INC

MARTINEZ ORLANDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLER STACEY ANN

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - (Amended)

8/10/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - (Amended)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/10/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

8/15/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/28/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

7/16/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Proof of Publication

5/22/2018: Proof of Publication

Application for Order to Publish

4/5/2018: Application for Order to Publish

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/20/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - on Complaint

10/25/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/25/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/25/2017: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/25/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2018
  • Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Amended Proof of Service by Substituted Service Amended Proof of Service of Summons; Filed by: Hulac-West, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Royal Dining Catering, Inc (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/08/17; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Hulac-West, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Royal Dining Catering, Inc (Defendant); Orlando Martinez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Default entered as to Royal Dining Catering, Inc Default not entered as to Orlando Martinez; On the Complaint filed by Hulac-West, LLC on 10/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Hulac-West, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Royal Dining Catering, Inc (Defendant); Orlando Martinez (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2018
  • Default entered as to Orlando Martinez Default not entered as to Royal Dining Catering, Inc; On the Complaint filed by Hulac-West, LLC on 10/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Proof of Publication; Filed by: Hulac-West, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Royal Dining Catering, Inc (Defendant); Orlando Martinez (Defendant); Mailing Date: 04/27/2018; Service Costs: 0.00; Service Costs Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • Application for Order to Publish; Filed by: Hulac-West, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Hulac-West, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Royal Dining Catering, Inc (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/08/2017; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by: Hulac-West, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Royal Dining Catering, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Hulac-West, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/24/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2017
  • Updated -- Summons on Complaint: Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 17STLC03562    Hearing Date: December 30, 2019    Dept: 31

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IS GRANTED.

On October 25, 2017, Plaintiff Hulac-West, LLC filed the instant action against Defendants Royal Dining Catering, Inc.; Orlando Martinez; and Does 1 to 10. The Complaint asserts a single cause of action for breach of contract. On August 10, 2018, default was entered as to Defendants Royal Dining Catering, Inc. and Orlando Martinez. On October 30, 2019, Does 1 to 10 were dismissed without prejudice.

Plaintiff seeks entry of a default judgment in the total amount of $70,473.46 against Defendants, with judgment entered against Defendant Royal Dining Catering, Inc. for $50,127.29 only and judgment entered against Defendant Orlando Martinez for the total amount of $70,473.46. Plaintiff has submitted the requisite documents and provided sufficient evidence to support the judgment and costs sought.

Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff’s request for default judgment is GRANTED as requested.