Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/19/2019 at 14:17:38 (UTC).

HUGO JARAMILLO, ET AL. VS JOSHUA SWODECK, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/22/2018 HUGO JARAMILLO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JOSHUA SWODECK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN J. TOWNSEND. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0237

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN J. TOWNSEND

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DE JARAMILLO CORINA

Upland, CA 91784

JARAMILLO HUGO

Upland, CA 91784

Defendants

SWODECK JOSHUA

Pomona, CA 91766

SWODECK CHARA N.

Pomona, CA 91766

BORDEAUX MARJI

Pomona, CA 91766

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/21/2018

2/21/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/21/2018

Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

2/21/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

2/21/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

2/2/2018: Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

2/2/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

Answer

1/29/2018: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

1/29/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

1/29/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/29/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/29/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/22/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/22/2018: Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

1/23/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Chara N. Swodeck)

1/23/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Chara N. Swodeck)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Marji Bordeaux)

1/23/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Marji Bordeaux)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Joshua Swodeck)

1/23/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Joshua Swodeck)

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

1/22/2018: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/22/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/02/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/21/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment / Dismissal / Other Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketJudgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/21/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 updated: Result Date to 02/21/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Corina De Jaramillo and Plaintiff Hugo Jaramillo against Defendant Joshua Swodeck and Defendant Chara N. Swodeck on the Complaint filed by Hugo Jaramillo, et al. on 01/22/2018 for holdover damages $450.00 and costs of $240.00 for a total of $690.00, joint and several.; Judgment for possession is not granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 565 W. Second Street, Unit 9, Pomona, CA 91766 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Corina De Jaramillo and Plaintiff Hugo Jaramillo against Defendant Marji Bordeaux on the Complaint filed by Hugo Jaramillo, et al. on 01/22/2018 for a total of $0.00.; Judgment for possession is not granted against all unnamed occupants pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure section 415.46.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 565 W. Second Street, Unit 9, Pomona, CA 91766 is granted for plaintiff(s);; The Rental Agreement under which the property is held is hereby cancelled.; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketRequest/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial; Filed by: Hugo Jaramillo (Plaintiff); Corina De Jaramillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer Trial; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Chara N. Swodeck (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Hugo Jaramillo (Plaintiff); Corina De Jaramillo (Plaintiff); As to: Joshua Swodeck (Defendant); Service Date: 01/24/2018; Service Cost: 25.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 01/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Hugo Jaramillo (Plaintiff); Corina De Jaramillo (Plaintiff); As to: Joshua Swodeck (Defendant); Chara N. Swodeck (Defendant); Marji Bordeaux (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Hugo Jaramillo (Plaintiff); Corina De Jaramillo (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Susan J. Townsend in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/02/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less