Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/27/2021 at 09:19:43 (UTC).

HUDSON H DUAN VS SASHA CHOQETTE

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 HUDSON H DUAN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SASHA CHOQETTE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is VICTOR M. ACEVEDO. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0768

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

VICTOR M. ACEVEDO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUAN HUDSON H

Defendant

CHOQETTE SASHA

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/02/2020

10/2/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/02/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/2/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 05/21/2020

5/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 05/21/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

5/21/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

6/16/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]

Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

6/16/2020: Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations - Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/26/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/28/2020

4/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/28/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/28/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

3/18/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

3/18/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3/18/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketOn the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Hudson H Duan on 03/18/2020, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/02/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 updated: Result Date to 10/02/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketNotice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Continuance Due to COVID-19 State of Emergency Declarations]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/04/2020 at 01:30 PM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 10/02/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/04/2020 at 01:30 PM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 05/21/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/28/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 06/30/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Hudson H Duan (Plaintiff); As to: Sasha Choqette (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/23/2020; Service Cost: 95.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 06/30/2020 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/28/2020 at 08:30 AM in Compton Courthouse at Department 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Victor M. Acevedo in Department 7 Compton Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Hudson H Duan (Plaintiff); As to: Sasha Choqette (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less