This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/02/2020 at 23:07:24 (UTC).

HUANG, CHU S VS COLDWELL BANKER GEORGE REALTY

Case Summary

On 03/09/2016 HUANG, CHU S filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against COLDWELL BANKER GEORGE REALTY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3065

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HUANG CHU S

HUANG TERESA

Defendants

ARCADIA INC

WANG AMY

GEORGE REALTY CO

COLDWELL BANKER GEORGE REALTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

HUANG, CHU S

LU TONY M

HUANG, TERESA

Defendant Attorney

TRESTER MANNING KASS ELLROD RAMIREZ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • DocketHEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2016
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED - ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 09/11/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77 * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • DocketOSC SET 03/11/19, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - LEGAL MALPRACTICE Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLDWELL BANKER GEORGE REALTY is a litigant

Latest cases where ARCADIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LU TONY M.