Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/18/2018 at 08:01:02 (UTC).

HOWARD W. RUSSELL, JR. VS DEREK PATTERSON

Case Summary

On 10/27/2017 HOWARD W RUSSELL, JR filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DEREK PATTERSON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL L. LOFTON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1659

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOEL L. LOFTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RUSSELL HOWARD W. JR.

Palmdale, CA 93591

Defendant

PATTERSON DEREK

San Diego, CA 92128

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

12/27/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/27/2017

12/27/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/27/2017

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/27/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/27/2017: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/27/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 12/27/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to lack of prosecution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Howard W. Russell, Jr. (Plaintiff); As to: Derek Patterson (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Howard W. Russell, Jr. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Joel L. Lofton in Department A22 Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/26/2017 at 08:30 AM in Michael Antonovich Antelope Valley Courthouse at Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/26/2017 at 08:30 AM in at Department A22 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 12/27/2017 08:30 AM at 12/27/2017 8:30 AM Non-Jury Trial in Department A22

    Read MoreRead Less