This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2019 at 09:56:25 (UTC).

HOWARD G CANTER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE CANTER BYPASS FAMILY TRUST VS VANESSA SALAS

Case Summary

On 11/16/2017 HOWARD G CANTER, AS TRUSTEE OF THE CANTER BYPASS FAMILY TRUST filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against VANESSA SALAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN J. TOWNSEND. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0524

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN J. TOWNSEND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HOWARD G CANTER AS TRUSTEE OF THE CANTER BYPASS FAMILY TRUST

Defendant

SALAS VANESSA

Covina, CA 91723

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIDDLE LAYNE LEA

 

Court Documents

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/8/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal

5/8/2018: Request for Dismissal

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

5/8/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

5/29/2018: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/16/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

11/16/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Complaint

11/16/2017: Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Vanessa Salas)

11/17/2017: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Vanessa Salas)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

11/17/2017: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/16/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

11/16/2017: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Writ - Return

1/10/2018: Writ - Return

Proof of Personal Service

12/8/2017: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/8/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/8/2017: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

12/14/2017: Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Application for Writ of Possession

12/14/2017: Application for Writ of Possession

Writ of (name extension) - Possession (Mail)

12/14/2017: Writ of (name extension) - Possession (Mail)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2018
  • Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Default judgment entered for Plaintiff Howard G Canter, As Trustee of the Canter Bypass Family trust against Defendant Vanessa Salas on the Complaint filed by Howard G Canter, As Trustee of the Canter Bypass Family trust on 11/16/2017 for the principal amount of $0.00, damages of $3,172.88, and costs of $490.00 for a total of $3,662.88.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • Updated -- Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service: Location changed from Civil Clerk's Office to Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Howard G Canter, As Trustee of the Canter Bypass Family trust (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1 - 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • On the Complaint filed by Howard G Canter, As Trustee of the Canter Bypass Family trust on 11/16/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1 - 10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Howard G Canter, As Trustee of the Canter Bypass Family trust (Plaintiff); As to: Vanessa Salas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Default entered as to Vanessa Salas; On the Complaint filed by Howard G Canter, As Trustee of the Canter Bypass Family trust on 11/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: Howard G Canter, As Trustee of the Canter Bypass Family trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Writ - Return ( Wholly Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • Judgment - Unlawful Detainer; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/08/2017
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Howard G Canter, As Trustee of the Canter Bypass Family trust (Plaintiff); As to: Unnamed Occupants; Vanessa Salas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Default entered as to Vanessa Salas; unnamed occupants pursuant to CCP 415.46; On the Complaint filed by Howard G Canter, As Trustee of the Canter Bypass Family trust on 11/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2017
  • Notice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 11/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by: Howard G Canter, As Trustee of the Canter Bypass Family trust (Plaintiff); As to: Vanessa Salas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Howard G Canter, As Trustee of the Canter Bypass Family trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Susan J. Townsend in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/29/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less