This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/18/2019 at 07:19:33 (UTC).

HORTIBEST PRODUCE, INC. VS C.M. PRODUCTS

Case Summary

On 08/06/2012 HORTIBEST PRODUCE, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against C M PRODUCTS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BRUCE E. MITCHELL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0532

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2012

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BRUCE E. MITCHELL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HORTIBEST PRODUCE INC.

Defendants

C.M. PRODUCTS LLC

C. M. PRODUCTS LLC

Assignee

G.R. ISIDRO

Not Classified By Court

MARTINEZ ESTHER

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/6/2012: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) ($35.00)

8/10/2012: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) ($35.00)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/10/2012: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Duplicate entry

9/10/2012: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Duplicate entry

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/10/2012: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order

9/10/2012: Minute Order - Minute Order

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

9/13/2012: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Other - (name extension) - Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear For Examination

10/18/2012: Other - (name extension) - Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear For Examination

RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL

10/30/2012: RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL

Proof of Service Not Plaintiffs / Defendants Claim - Proof of Service Not Plaintiffs / Defendants Claim

11/1/2012: Proof of Service Not Plaintiffs / Defendants Claim - Proof of Service Not Plaintiffs / Defendants Claim

Clerk's Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Minute Order and Clerk's Notice of Ruling

12/3/2012: Clerk's Certificate of Mailing - Clerk's Certificate of Mailing Minute Order and Clerk's Notice of Ruling

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration re: Accrued Interest ($13.01)

5/20/2013: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration re: Accrued Interest ($13.01)

Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

5/22/2013: Writ of Execution - Writ of Execution

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

9/30/2014: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment - Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination - Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

6/3/2019: Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination - Application and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

6/6/2019: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Subpoena & Proof of Service - Subpoena & Proof of Service

6/21/2019: Subpoena & Proof of Service - Subpoena & Proof of Service

Subpoena & Proof of Service - Subpoena & Proof of Service

6/21/2019: Subpoena & Proof of Service - Subpoena & Proof of Service

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Service Not Plaintiff?s / Defendant?s Claim (Order For Examination and Subpoena Proof of Service With Attachment 1,2,3,4); Filed by: As to: C.M. Products LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketSubpoena & Proof of Service; Filed by: (HORTIBEST PRODUCE, INC.) (Plaintiff); As to: Esther Martinez (Non-Party)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • DocketSubpoena & Proof of Service; Filed by: (HORTIBEST PRODUCE, INC.) (Plaintiff); As to: C.M. Products LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Assignment of Judgment: As To Parties: (HORTIBEST PRODUCE, INC.) (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department A - Hon. Annabelle G. Cortez; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketHearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 07/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Duplicate entry: Name Extension: - Duplicate entry; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: G.R. ISIDRO (Assignee)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • DocketApplication and Order to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear for Examination; Issued and Filed by: G.R. ISIDRO (Assignee); As to: (C. M. PRODUCTS) LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2012
  • DocketOrder to Produce Statement of Assets and to Appear For Examination; Filed by: (HORTIBEST PRODUCE, INC.) (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (C.M. PRODUCTS), LLC .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (C.M. PRODUCTS), LLC , SIGNED BY ARMANDO MARTINEZ .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (C.M. PRODUCTS), LLC , SIGNED BY ARMANDO MARTINEZ .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (HORTIBEST PRODUCE, INC.) , SIGNED BY FRANCISCO HERNANDEZ .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • DocketCAUSE CALLED AT 02:00P M, IN DEPT. 002 , HON. BRUCE E. MITCHELL, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING BY FRANCISCO HERNANDEZ, IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES . DEFENDANT APPEARING BY ARMANDO MARTINEZ, IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • DocketCOURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2012
  • DocketJUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 09/10/12 . FOR (HORTIBEST PRODUCE, INC.) . AGAINST (C.M. PRODUCTS), LLC . PRINCIPAL $ 4642.25 . COSTS $ 85.00 . TOTAL $ 4727.25 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (C.M. PRODUCTS), LLC . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 09/10/12 AT 02:00P M, IN DEPT. 002 . COSTS OF $ 35.00 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2012
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ALH507217005. HEARING SET FOR 09/10/12 AT 02:00 PM IN DPT. 002.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less