This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/16/2016 at 12:14:31 (UTC).

HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC VS AVALOS, FRANCISCO

Case Summary

On 05/01/2015 HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against AVALOS, FRANCISCO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5245

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC

Defendants

AVALOS FRANCISCO

AVALOS MARIA

AVALOS ROBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ACTION LEGAL TEAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2015
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED; RETURN BY MAIL/OR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2015
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION REJECTED; NO JUDGMENT AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2015
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION REJECTED-ONE DEBTOR PER BOX-MAILED OUT-AB;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2015
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS TO UNNAMED OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2015
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/27/2015
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND NOT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FOR UNNAMED TENANTS FILED. MAILED 05/09/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • OSC SET 10/28/15, 08:30 AM, DEPT. CLK PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • COMPLAINT FILED - U.D. RESIDENTIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT INC is a litigant