This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 01:33:40 (UTC).

HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC. VS JACOB GORENSHTEYN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/22/2018 HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT GROUP, INC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JACOB GORENSHTEYN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARK A. YOUNG. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0241

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARK A. YOUNG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT GROUP INC.

Defendants

GORENSHTEYN ALEX

Los Angeles, CA 90046

GORENSHTEYN JACOB

Los Angeles, CA 90046

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLOCK DENNIS P

Defendant Attorneys

OPPENHEIM LUCAS

PRADO DIANNE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

2/16/2018: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Proof of Personal Service

2/16/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Unlawful Detainer Stipulation and Judgment

3/6/2018: Unlawful Detainer Stipulation and Judgment

Writ - Return

5/22/2018: Writ - Return

Minute Order - (JURY TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER)

3/6/2018: Minute Order - (JURY TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER)

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

3/2/2018: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice on Hearing About Court Fees

3/2/2018: Notice on Hearing About Court Fees

Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Additional Court Fees]

2/20/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) Additional Court Fees]

Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

2/14/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

Summons - on Complaint

1/22/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/22/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Answer

1/29/2018: Answer

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

1/23/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Alex Gorenshteyn)

1/23/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Alex Gorenshteyn)

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Sanctions scheduled for 07/23/2018 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S updated: Result Date to 07/23/2018; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Wholly Satisfied);; Costs Credits: 145.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Wholly Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Writ of Possession: Result: Returned and Filed; Result Date: 05/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • DocketWrit of Possession; Issued by: Clerk; County: Los Angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketApplication for Writ of Possession; Filed by: Horizon Real Estate Management Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); Daily Rental Value: 33.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • DocketFee Waiver Reconsideration Hearing scheduled for 03/12/2018 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S updated: Result Date to 03/12/2018; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (JURY TRIAL UNLAWFUL DETAINER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketStipulated judgment entered for Plaintiff Horizon Real Estate Management Group, Inc., A Calif. Corp against Defendant Gorenshteyn, Alex and Defendant Jacob Gorenshteyn on the Complaint filed by Horizon Real Estate Management Group, Inc. on 01/22/2018 for past rent due in the amount of $0.00 and holdover damages $0.00 for a total of $0.00.; Other: Defendants agree to vacate the subject premises by April 30, 2018 at 11:59p.m. The Court retains jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement pursuant to C.C.P. Section 664.6. See the Unlawful Detainer Stipulation and Judgment form for full terms and conditions. A copy of the signed stipulation is provided to counsel.; Restitution and possession of the premises located at 1042 N. Stanley Ave., #8, Los Angeles, CA 90046 is granted for plaintiff(s);; Lease Agreement under which the property is held is hereby forfeited.; Writ to issue forthwith, but no lockout prior to 05/01/2018.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • DocketUnlawful Detainer Stipulation and Judgment; Filed by: Horizon Real Estate Management Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Jacob Gorenstein Erroneously Sued As Jacob Gorenshteyn (Defendant); Alex Gorenshteyn (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2018
  • DocketFee Waiver Reconsideration Hearing scheduled for 03/12/2018 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 01/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Horizon Real Estate Management Group, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Jacom Gorenshteyn (Defendant); Alex Gorenshteyn (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Horizon Real Estate Management Group, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Mark A. Young in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/02/2018 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause re: Sanctions scheduled for 07/23/2018 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 03/06/2018 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HORIZON REAL ESTATE MANAGEMENT GROUP INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OPPENHEIM LUCAS

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRAO DIANNE