This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/05/2019 at 00:50:59 (UTC).

HORD, PETER VS ANDERSON, ROBERT

Case Summary

On 12/16/2015 HORD, PETER filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ANDERSON, ROBERT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL SMALL. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****8861

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL SMALL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HORD PETER

Defendant

ANDERSON ROBERT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • COURT TAKES MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • ON THE CLAIM OF DEFENDANT, ONLY, THE COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS: JUDGMENT ENTERED ON 03/11/16 . FOR (HORD, PETER) . AGAINST (ANDERSON, ROBERT) . PRINCIPAL $ 0.00 . COSTS $ 0.00 . TOTAL $ .00 . EXECUTION STAYED 0 DAYS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2016
  • COURT'S WRITTEN DECISION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 10:40A M, IN DEPT. NE2 , HON. MICHAEL SMALL, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • COURT TAKES MATTER UNDER SUBMISSION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2016
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING SMALL CLAIMS COURT TRIAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/01/16 AT 08:15A M, IN DEPT. NE2 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2016
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED RE: ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2015
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (ANDERSON, ROBERT) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • CASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT. NE2 FOR CONSIDERATION RE: REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • DEFENDANT'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO PLAINTIFF FILED BY (ANDERSON, ROBERT) . RECEIPT # FEE WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (ANDERSON, ROBERT) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (ANDERSON, ROBERT) . MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 03/03/16 AT 08:15A M, IN DEPT. NE2 . COSTS OF $ 40.00 . FEE WAIVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (HORD, PETER) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (HORD, PETER) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE COMPLETED BY HAND DELIVERING A COPY OF THE ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER TO THE APPLICANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN FEE WAIVER. HEARING SET FOR 03/01/16 AT 08:15 AM IN DPT. NE2.

    Read MoreRead Less