This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/29/2021 at 02:05:23 (UTC).

HIRSCHBACH MOTOR LINES, INC, A CORPORATION VS JOSE J. ANDALON

Case Summary

On 04/15/2019 HIRSCHBACH MOTOR LINES, INC, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against JOSE J ANDALON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3674

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HIRSCHBACH MOTOR LINES INC A CORPORATION

Defendant

ANDALON JOSE J. DBA J. ANDALON TRUCKING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAINES TODD F.

 

Court Documents

Order (name extension) - Order ON STIPULATION FOR OCURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION AND ENTER DISMISSAL

8/26/2021: Order (name extension) - Order ON STIPULATION FOR OCURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION AND ENTER DISMISSAL

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

8/26/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

Stipulation for Judgment - Stipulation for Judgment

8/26/2021: Stipulation for Judgment - Stipulation for Judgment

Notice (name extension) - Notice CONTINUANCE OF OSC

6/28/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice CONTINUANCE OF OSC

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 07/06/2021

7/6/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)) of 07/06/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

7/6/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

1/20/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

12/18/2019: Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted - Motion to Deem RFA's Admitted

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

2/4/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")) of 02/04/2020

2/4/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery")) of 02/04/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted; He...) of 02/05/2020

2/5/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted; He...) of 02/05/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted; He...)

2/5/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Deem Request for Admissions Admitted; He...)

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

2/6/2020: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

9/3/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/03/2020

9/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order) of 09/03/2020

Answer - Answer

5/29/2019: Answer - Answer

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/15/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/15/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketOrder - Dismissal; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketStipulation for Judgment; Filed by: HIRSCHBACH MOTOR LINES, INC, A CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: JOSE J. ANDALON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketOrder ON STIPULATION FOR OCURT TO RETAIN JURISDICTION AND ENTER DISMISSAL; Signed and Filed by: HIRSCHBACH MOTOR LINES, INC, A CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: JOSE J. ANDALON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) scheduled for 08/26/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 08/26/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by HIRSCHBACH MOTOR LINES, INC, A CORPORATION on 04/15/2019, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/18/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 05/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing: Status Date changed from 07/08/2021 to 07/21/2021; As To Parties: removed; Status changed from Rejected to Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing: Status Date changed from 07/08/2021 to 07/21/2021; As To Parties: removed; Status changed from Rejected to Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing, Notice of Rejection of Electronic Filing]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: JOSE J. ANDALON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: HIRSCHBACH MOTOR LINES, INC, A CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: JOSE J. ANDALON (Defendant); Service Date: 05/02/2019; Service Cost: 74.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/18/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: HIRSCHBACH MOTOR LINES, INC, A CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: JOSE J. ANDALON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: HIRSCHBACH MOTOR LINES, INC, A CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: JOSE J. ANDALON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: HIRSCHBACH MOTOR LINES, INC, A CORPORATION (Plaintiff); As to: JOSE J. ANDALON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC03674    Hearing Date: February 05, 2020    Dept: 26

Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc. v. Andalon, et al

MOTION TO DEEM REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION ADMITTED; SANCTIONS

(CCP § 2033.280)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc.’s Motion to Deem Admitted Matters served on Defendant Jose J. Andalon, is GRANTED. DEFENDANT IS TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $510.00 WITHIN 30 DAYS’ NOTICE OF THIS ORDER.

ANALYSIS:

On September 9, 2019, Plaintiff Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc. (“Plaintiff”) served Requests for Admissions on Defendant Jose J. Andalon (“Defendant”). (Motion, Tapper Decl., Exh. A.) To date, Plaintiff has not received verified responses to the discovery requests from Defendant. (Id. at ¶5.) As a result, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Deem the Truth of Matters Specified in Requests for Admissions to Defendant as Admitted and for Monetary Sanctions (the “Motion”) on December 18, 2019.

Defendant has not provided verified responses to the discovery propounded by Plaintiff nor filed an opposition to the motion. There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer effort before a motion to deem requests for admission can be filed. Further, the motion can be brought any time after the responding party fails to provide the responses.

The Court finds the failure to respond a misuse of the discovery process. Sanctions are appropriate under CCP §§ 2023.010, 2023.030 and 2033.280, and have been properly noticed. Sanctions are granted against Defendant in the amount of $510.00, based on two hours of attorney time billed at $225.00 per hour, plus the $60.00 filing fee. (Motion, Tapper Decl., ¶6.)

Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff’s Motion to Deem Requests for Admission Admitted is GRANTED.

DEFENDANT IS TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $510.00 WITHIN 30 DAYS’ NOTICE OF THIS ORDER.

Moving party to give notice.

Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc. v. Andalon, et al

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES; SANCTIONS

(CCP § 2030.290)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc.’s Motion Compelling Defendant Jose J. Andalon To Respond To Form Interrogatories, Set One, is GRANTED. DEFENDANT IS TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTION WITHIN 20 DAYS. ADDITIONALLY, DEFENDANT IS TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $510.00 WITHIN 30 DAYS’ NOTICE OF THIS ORDER.

ANALYSIS:

On September 9, 2019, Plaintiff Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc. (“Plaintiff”) served Form Interrogatories on Defendant Jose J. Andalon (“Defendant”). (Motion, Tapper Decl., Exh. A.)  To date, Plaintiff has not received verified responses to the discovery requests from Defendant. (Id. at ¶5.) As a result, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Compel Responses and for Monetary Sanctions (the “Motion”) on December 18, 2019.

Defendant has not provided verified responses to the discovery propounded by Plaintiff nor filed an opposition to the motion. There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer effort before a motion to deem requests for admission can be filed. Further, the motion can be brought any time after the responding party fails to provide the responses. Therefore, Defendant is entitled to verified responses without objection.

The Court finds the failure to respond a misuse of the discovery process. Sanctions are appropriate under Code of Civil Procedure sections 2023.010, 2023.030 and 2033.280, and have been properly noticed. Sanctions are granted against Defendant in the amount of $510.00, based on two hours of attorney time billed at $225.00 per hour, plus the $60.00 filing fee. (Motion, Tapper Decl., ¶6.)

Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc.’s Motion Compelling Defendant Jose J. Andalon To Respond To Form Interrogatories, Set One, is GRANTED. DEFENDANT IS TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTION WITHIN 20 DAYS. ADDITIONALLY, DEFENDANT IS TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $510.00 WITHIN 30 DAYS’ NOTICE OF THIS ORDER.

Moving party to give notice.

Case Number: 19STLC03674    Hearing Date: February 04, 2020    Dept: 26

Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc. v. Andalon, et al

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES; SANCTIONS

(CCP § 2030.290)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc.’s Motion Compelling Defendant Jose J. Andalon To Respond To Form Interrogatories, Set One, is GRANTED. DEFENDANT IS TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTION WITHIN 20 DAYS. ADDITIONALLY, DEFENDANT IS TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $510.00 WITHIN 30 DAYS’ NOTICE OF THIS ORDER.

ANALYSIS:

On September 9, 2019, Plaintiff Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc. (“Plaintiff”) served Form Interrogatories on Defendant Jose J. Andalon (“Defendant”). (Motion, Tapper Decl., Exh. A.)  To date, Plaintiff has not received verified responses to the discovery requests from Defendant. (Id. at ¶5.) As a result, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Compel Responses and for Monetary Sanctions (the “Motion”) on December 18, 2019.

Defendant has not provided verified responses to the discovery propounded by Plaintiff nor filed an opposition to the motion. There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer effort before a motion to deem requests for admission can be filed. Further, the motion can be brought any time after the responding party fails to provide the responses. Therefore, Defendant is entitled to verified responses without objection.

The Court finds the failure to respond a misuse of the discovery process. Sanctions are appropriate under Code of Civil Procedure sections 2023.010, 2023.030 and 2033.280, and have been properly noticed. Sanctions are granted against Defendant in the amount of $510.00, based on two hours of attorney time billed at $225.00 per hour, plus the $60.00 filing fee. (Motion, Tapper Decl., ¶6.)

Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc.’s Motion Compelling Defendant Jose J. Andalon To Respond To Form Interrogatories, Set One, is GRANTED. DEFENDANT IS TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTION WITHIN 20 DAYS. ADDITIONALLY, DEFENDANT IS TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $510.00 WITHIN 30 DAYS’ NOTICE OF THIS ORDER.

Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hirschbach Motor Lines, Inc. is a litigant