This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/15/2021 at 01:51:11 (UTC).

HIRSCH PIPE & SUPPLY CO., INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS MAXXIM PLUMBING CORP., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/06/2020 HIRSCH PIPE SUPPLY CO , INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MAXXIM PLUMBING CORP , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3852

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HIRSCH PIPE & SUPPLY CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

GOULDEN KELLY

BUZZELLI RANDY

MAXXIM PLUMBING CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

HERRERA HECTOR

HPI/GSA-1E LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

THE SPEED HAWSE LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

STAROBA SAMANTHA

RIGGEN SAMANTHA

 

Court Documents

Request (name extension) - Request to Vacate Default Judgment and Enter Amended Judgment

10/1/2021: Request (name extension) - Request to Vacate Default Judgment and Enter Amended Judgment

Judgment - Judgment [Proposed] Amended Judgment

10/1/2021: Judgment - Judgment [Proposed] Amended Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

9/13/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Request to Vacate Default Judgment and Enter Amended Judgment

9/13/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Request to Vacate Default Judgment and Enter Amended Judgment

Judgment - Judgment [Proposed] Judgment

4/14/2021: Judgment - Judgment [Proposed] Judgment

Notice of Status Conference and Order - Notice of Status Conference and Order

5/24/2021: Notice of Status Conference and Order - Notice of Status Conference and Order

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Request to Vacate Default Judgment and Enter Amended Judgment

6/7/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Request to Vacate Default Judgment and Enter Amended Judgment

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Withdrawal of Request for Default Judgment Against Defendants Maxxim Plumbing Corp. and Hector Herrera

4/28/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Withdrawal of Request for Default Judgment Against Defendants Maxxim Plumbing Corp. and Hector Herrera

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Bankruptcy Filing and Automatic Stay as to Hector Herrera

4/22/2021: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Bankruptcy Filing and Automatic Stay as to Hector Herrera

Order (name extension) - Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Consolidate Actions

3/17/2021: Order (name extension) - Order [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Consolidate Actions

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/14/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Larry Willner in Lieu of Testimony in Support of a Joint and Several Default Judgment

4/14/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Larry Willner in Lieu of Testimony in Support of a Joint and Several Default Judgment

Summary of the Case - Summary of the Case

4/14/2021: Summary of the Case - Summary of the Case

Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

4/14/2021: Request for Judicial Notice - Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4/14/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate)

3/17/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate)

Motion to Consolidate - Motion to Consolidate

3/17/2021: Motion to Consolidate - Motion to Consolidate

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

3/18/2021: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Hirsch Pipe & Supply Co., Inc., a California corporation against Defendant Maxxim Plumbing Corp., a California corporation on the Complaint filed by Hirsch Pipe & Supply Co., Inc., a California corporation on 05/06/2020 for the principal amount of $21,749.04, attorney fees of $1,042.47, interest of $4,066.67, and costs of $1,366.85 for a total of $28,225.03.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Vacate Default Judgment and Enter Amended Judgment: Status Date changed from 09/13/2021 to 10/01/2021; Result Date changed from 09/15/2021 to 10/01/2021; As To Parties: removed; Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketJudgment [Proposed] Amended Judgment; Signed and Filed by: Hirsch Pipe & Supply Co., Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketStatus Conference Re: Bankruptcy scheduled for 11/03/2021 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 10/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Request to Vacate Default Judgment and Enter Amended Judgment: Filed By: Hirsch Pipe & Supply Co., Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 09/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Plaintiff's Request to Vacate Default Judgment and Enter Amended Judgment; Filed by: Hirsch Pipe & Supply Co., Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Hirsch Pipe & Supply Co., Inc., a California corporation on 05/22/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by Hirsch Pipe & Supply Co., Inc., a California corporation as to Hector Herrera

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketRequest to Vacate Default Judgment and Enter Amended Judgment; Filed by: Hirsch Pipe & Supply Co., Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); Charge Fee ?: YES

    Read MoreRead Less
55 More Docket Entries
  • 05/12/2020
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by: Hirsch Pipe & Supply Co., Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/10/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Hirsch Pipe & Supply Co., Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Maxxim Plumbing Corp., a California corporation (Defendant); Hector Herrera (Defendant); Randy Buzzelli (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Hirsch Pipe & Supply Co., Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Maxxim Plumbing Corp., a California corporation (Defendant); Hector Herrera (Defendant); Randy Buzzelli (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Hirsch Pipe & Supply Co., Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Maxxim Plumbing Corp., a California corporation (Defendant); Hector Herrera (Defendant); Randy Buzzelli (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Complaint: Status Date changed from 05/22/2020 to 05/06/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC03852    Hearing Date: March 17, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Wed., March 17, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Hirsch Pipe & Supply Co., Inc. v. Maxxim Plumbing Corp., et al.

CASE NUMBER: 20STLC03852 COMPL. FILED: 05-06-20

NOTICE: OK DISC. C/O: 10-31-21

DISC. MOT. C/O: 10-15-21

TRIAL DATE: 11-03-21

PROCEEDINGS: MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE ACTIONS

MOVING PARTY: Plaintiff Hirsch Pipe & Supply Co., Inc.

RESP. PARTY: None

MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE

(CCP § 1048; CRC 3.350)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Hirsch Pipe & Supply Co., Inc.’s Motion to Consolidate Actions is GRANTED ON THE CONDITION THAT, before the hearing, Plaintiff files supplemental papers correcting the procedural errors noted herein.

Otherwise, the hearing will be CONTINUED TO MAY 19, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. If continued, Plaintiff will be ordered to file and serve supplemental papers addressing the noted errors at least 16 court days before the next hearing.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of March 15, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of March 15, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On May 6, 2020, Plaintiff Hirsch Pipe & Supply Co., Inc. (“Plaintiff”) filed an action for breach of contract, common counts, and foreclosure of mechanic’s lien against Defendants Maxxim Plumbing Corp. (“Maxxim”), Hector Herrera (“Herrera”), Randy Buzzelli (“Buzzelli”), and Kelly Goulden (“Goulden”).

Following their failure to respond, default was entered as to Defendants Herrera, Buzzelli, and Goulden on September 17, 2020 and against Defendant Maxxim on September 28, 2020. Defendants Buzzelli and Goulden were dismissed from the action on November 12, 2020.

On May 22, Plaintiff filed a separate action against Defendants Maxxim, Herrera, HPI/GSA-1E (“HPI”), and The Speed Hawse, LLC (“Speed Hawse”), entitled Hirsch Pipe & Supply Co., Inc. v. Maxxim Plumbing Corp., et al., Case No. 20STLC04420.

Plaintiff filed a Notice of Related Case for Case No. 20STLC04420 on November 30, 2020. On December 18, the Court found this action and Case No. 20STLC04420 related within the meaning of California Rules of Court, rule 3.300. (12/18/20 Minute Order.) This case was designated as the lead case. (Id.)

On February 4, 2020, Plaintiff filed the instant Motion to Consolidate Actions (the “Motion”). No opposition was filed.

  1. Legal Standard

California Rules of Court, rule 3.350, subdivision (a) states in relevant part:

(1) A notice of motion to consolidate must:

(A) List all named parties in each case, the names of those who have appeared, and the names of their respective attorneys of record;

(B) Contain the captions of all the cases sought to be consolidated, with the lowest-numbered case shown first; and

(C) Be filed in each case sought to be consolidated.

(2) The motion to consolidate:

(A) Is deemed a single motion for the purpose of determining the appropriate filing fee, but memorandums, declarations, and other supporting papers must be filed only in the lowest-numbered case;

(B) Must be served on all attorneys of record and all non-represented parties in all of the cases sought to be consolidated; and

(C) Must have a proof of service filed as part of the motion.

(Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.350, subd. (a)). (Emphasis added.) Also, the consolidation statute, Code of Civil Procedure section 1048, states in relevant part:

(a) When actions involving a common question of law or fact are pending before the court, it may order a joint hearing or trial of any or all the matters in issue in the actions; it may order all the actions consolidated and it may make such orders concerning proceedings therein as may tend to avoid unnecessary costs or delay.

(b) The court, in furtherance of convenience or to avoid prejudice, or when separate trials will be conducive to expedition and economy, may order a separate trial of any cause of action, including a cause of action asserted in a cross-complaint, or of any separate issue or of any number of causes of action or issues, preserving the right of trial by jury required by the Constitution or a statute of this state or of the United States.

(Code Civ. Proc., § 1048, subd. (a).) The granting or denial of the motion to consolidate rests in the sound discretion of the trial court and will not be reversed except upon a clear showing of abuse of discretion. (See Fellner v. Steinbaum (1955) 132 Cal.App.2d 509, 511.)

  1. Discussion

Plaintiff seeks to consolidate this action and Case No. 20STLC04420. (Mot., p. 2:10-10-13.) Plaintiff explains that both actions involve Defendant Maxxim’s request for materials for construction projects, one located at 160 Hill St., Hermosa Beach, CA 90254 (“Project 1”) and the other located at 3840 Crenshaw Blvd., Los Angeles, CA 90008 (“Project 2”). (Mot., p. 4: 9-15.) After Defendant Maxxim failed to pay Plaintiff for those materials, Plaintiff recorded mechanic’s liens against both projects and initiated two separate actions, one for each project, against Defendants Maxxim and Herrera, the owner of Defendant Maxxim, and the projects’ respective owners. (Id. at p. 4:13-20.) After the actions were filed, however, the defendant owners of the projects signed declarations for Plaintiff attesting under oath that the materials sold to Defendants Maxxim were not used in the Projects as Defendant Maxxim had represented to Plaintiff. (Id., p. 2:3-9; Willner Decl., ¶ 8.) As a result, the owners of the Projects were dismissed from both actions and the only parties remaining are Plaintiff, Defendant Maxxim, and Defendant Herrera. (Id.)

Plaintiff states that both actions involve the same parties, the same causes of action, and the same witnesses. (Notice of Mot., p. 3:7-9.) Plaintiff also argues that proceeding with both cases together will avoid unnecessary costs and the expenditure of judicial resources. (Mot., p. 3: 6-11.) The Court finds consolidation of this case and Case No. 20STLC04420 is proper and in the interest of judicial economy.

Although the Court is inclined to grant the Motion, the Court notes that Plaintiff did not comply with California Rules of Court, rule 3.350. Specifically, Plaintiff did not file a copy of this Motion in Case No. 20STLC04420 as required by California Rules of Court Rule 3.350, subdivision (a)(1)(C), and did not include in the caption of the Motion all of the cases sought to be consolidated as required by Subdivision (a)(1)(B).

In the interest of judicial economy, the Motion is GRANTED ON THE CONDITION THAT, before the hearing, Plaintiff files supplemental papers correcting the errors noted above. Otherwise, the hearing will be continued.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiff Hirsch Pipe & Supply Co., Inc.’s Motion to Consolidate Actions is GRANTED ON THE CONDITION THAT, before the hearing, Plaintiff files supplemental papers correcting the procedural errors noted herein.

Otherwise, the hearing will be CONTINUED TO MAY 19, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Department 25 at the SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. If continued, Plaintiff will be ordered to file and serve supplemental papers addressing the noted errors at least 16 court days before the next hearing.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HIRSCH PIPE & SUPPLY CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant