This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/02/2019 at 07:45:21 (UTC).

HING WA LEE PLAZA II, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS RAY CHEN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 08/19/2019 a Contract - Other Contract case was filed by HING WA LEE PLAZA II, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY against RAY CHEN in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7691

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

HING WA LEE PLAZA II LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CHEN RAY AKA NONG CHEN

RAY CHEN & CO. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHENG AARON

Defendant Attorney

SHYN CASIO

 

Court Documents

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

10/4/2019: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Answer - Answer

10/4/2019: Answer - Answer

Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff s Complaint

9/27/2019: Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff s Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/30/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

8/19/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

8/19/2019: Complaint - Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

8/19/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2022
  • Hearing08/22/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • Hearing02/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Hearing12/17/2019 at 10:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion - Other (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Ray Chen (Defendant); Ray Chen & Co., a California corporation (Defendant); As to: Hing Wa Lee Plaza II, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: Ray Chen (Defendant); Ray Chen & Co., a California corporation (Defendant); As to: Hing Wa Lee Plaza II, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion - Other Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint scheduled for 12/17/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketMotion re: Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff s Complaint; Filed by: Ray Chen (Defendant); Ray Chen & Co., a California corporation (Defendant); As to: Hing Wa Lee Plaza II, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Hing Wa Lee Plaza II, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Ray Chen (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/29/2019; Service Cost: 125.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/22/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Hing Wa Lee Plaza II, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Ray Chen (Defendant); Ray Chen & Co., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Hing Wa Lee Plaza II, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Ray Chen (Defendant); Ray Chen & Co., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Hing Wa Lee Plaza II, LLC, a California limited liability company (Plaintiff); As to: Ray Chen (Defendant); Ray Chen & Co., a California corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC07691    Hearing Date: December 17, 2019    Dept: 94

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT

(CCP § 1054(a))

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendants Ray Chen and Ray Chen & Co.’s Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff’s Complaint is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

ANALYSIS:

I. Discussion

On August 19, 2019, Plaintiff Hing Wa Lee Plaza II, LLC (“Plaintiff”) filed a breach of contract action against Defendants Ray Chen and Ray Chen & Co. (collectively, “Defendants”). On August 28, 2019, Defendants were served by substituted service. On September 27, 2019, Defendants filed this Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff’s Complaint (the “Motion”).

On October 4, 2019, Defendants filed an Answer and a Cross-Complaint.

II. Conclusion and Order

Because Defendant has already filed an answer, no time extension is needed. Defendant’s Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff’s Complaint is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

Court clerk to give notice.