This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/09/2020 at 19:52:24 (UTC).

HILL COMMERCIAL INVESTMENTS, INC., A CORPORATION VS UNITED PACIFIC WASTE, A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 04/19/2019 HILL COMMERCIAL INVESTMENTS, INC , A CORPORATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNITED PACIFIC WASTE, A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is CAROL ROSE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2097

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

CAROL ROSE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HILL COMMERCIAL INVESTMENTS INC. A CORPORATION

Defendant

UNITED PACIFIC WASTE A CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

9/16/2019: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial; Non-Jury Trial)

9/16/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial; Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial; Non-Jury Trial) of 09/16/2019, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

9/16/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial; Non-Jury Trial) of 09/16/2019, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

9/16/2019: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

8/5/2019: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Amended)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

8/13/2019: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

7/8/2019: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

7/8/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

6/11/2019: Notice of Rejection - Notice of Rejection

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

6/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

4/19/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Payment Due

Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

4/19/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): As To Parties changed from United Pacific Waste, a corporation (Defendant) to United Pacific Waste, a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Hill Commercial Investments, Inc., a corporation against Defendant United Pacific Waste, a corporation on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Hill Commercial Investments, Inc., a corporation on 04/19/2019 for the principal amount of $5,000.00 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $5,090.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Hill Commercial Investments, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial; Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial; Non-Jury Trial) of 09/16/2019, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 09/16/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 09/16/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Hill Commercial Investments, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: United Pacific Waste, a corporation (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 08/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court: As To Parties changed from United Pacific Waste, a corporation (Defendant) to United Pacific Waste, a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Notice of Rejection: As To Parties changed from Hill Commercial Investments, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff) to Hill Commercial Investments, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketNotice of Rejection; Issued by: Clerk; As to: Hill Commercial Investments, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice of Rejection]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/09/2019 at 08:30 AM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Carol Rose in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Hill Commercial Investments, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: United Pacific Waste, a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Hill Commercial Investments, Inc., a corporation (Plaintiff); As to: United Pacific Waste, a corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED PACIFIC WASTE is a litigant