This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/26/2021 at 11:46:53 (UTC).

HELENA CABRERA VS GONZALO TAFOLLA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 HELENA CABRERA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GONZALO TAFOLLA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Bellflower Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL J. PEARCE. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2642

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Bellflower Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MICHAEL J. PEARCE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CABRERA HELENA

Defendants

TAFOLLA GONZALO

GONZALEZ JUAN

 

Court Documents

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

1/12/2021: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/30/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/30/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

11/24/2020: Receipt for Exhibits - Receipt for Exhibits

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

11/24/2020: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Other - (name extension) - Other - Exhibits Receipt

11/24/2020: Other - (name extension) - Other - Exhibits Receipt

Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

11/24/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/24/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

11/24/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/24/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

11/24/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/24/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

9/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment entered on 01/13/2021 ; Status Date changed from 11/24/2020 to 01/13/2021 ; Status changed from Entered to Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: HELENA CABRERA (Plaintiff); As to: GONZALO TAFOLLA (Defendant); JUAN GONZALEZ (Defendant); Type: Full Satisfaction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/24/2020 at 01:30 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1 updated: Result Date to 11/24/2020; Result Type to Held - Taken under Submission

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Ruling on Submitted Matter) of 11/24/2020, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketOther - Exhibits Receipt; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketReceipt for Exhibits; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff HELENA CABRERA against Defendant JUAN GONZALEZ and Defendant GONZALO TAFOLLA on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by HELENA CABRERA on 09/24/2020 for the principal amount of $1,200.00 and costs of $175.00 for a total of $1,375.00, joint and several.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: HELENA CABRERA (Plaintiff); As to: GONZALO TAFOLLA (Defendant); Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: HELENA CABRERA (Plaintiff); As to: JUAN GONZALEZ (Defendant); Service Cost: 35.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/24/2020 at 01:30 PM in Bellflower Courthouse at Department 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael J. Pearce in Department 1 Bellflower Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: HELENA CABRERA (Plaintiff); As to: GONZALO TAFOLLA (Defendant); JUAN GONZALEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less