This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/07/2021 at 08:35:13 (UTC).

HEIKE UTSCH, MS. VS RAINER WICKEL, MR

Case Summary

On 12/09/2020 HEIKE UTSCH, MS filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RAINER WICKEL, MR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2747

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UTSCH HEIKE MS.

Defendant

WICKEL RAINER MR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZEUTZIUS WILLIAM J. JR

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

7/6/2021: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial), Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)], Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

4/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial), Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)], Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/07/2021, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

4/7/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/07/2021, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

4/7/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/7/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Notice of Online Dispute Resolution Meet and Confer]

2/26/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Notice of Online Dispute Resolution Meet and Confer]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/08/2021

2/8/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/08/2021

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

2/8/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/28/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/9/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by: William J. Zeutzius, Jr (Attorney); As to: Heike Utsch, Ms. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Heike Utsch Ms. against Defendant Rainer Wickel Mr on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Heike Utsch, Ms. on 12/09/2020 for the principal amount of $6,057.50 and costs of $276.00 for a total of $6,333.50.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/07/2021, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets (NOT MAILED-INCORRECT DATE): Status Date changed from 04/07/2021 to 04/07/2021; Name Extension changed from (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/07/2021, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets to (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/07/2021, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets (NOT MAILED-INCORRECT DATE); As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial), Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)], Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Certificate of Mailing for [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial), Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)], Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets (CORRECT NOTICE): Name Extension changed from [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial), Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)], Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets to [Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial), Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)], Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets (CORRECT NOTICE); As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 04/07/2021, Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 04/07/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCase reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department A - Hon. Beverly Bourne; Reason: Other

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Notice Notice of Online Dispute Resolution Meet and Confer]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/08/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • DocketPursuant to the request of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/08/2021 at 03:00 PM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Held - Continued was rescheduled to 04/07/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Heike Utsch, Ms. (Plaintiff); As to: Rainer Wickel, Mr (Defendant); Service Cost: 155.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 12/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Heike Utsch, Ms. (Plaintiff); As to: Rainer Wickel, Mr (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketCase assigned in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/08/2021 at 03:00 PM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketNotice Of Remote Appearances and Exchange and Submission of Evidence Protocol. Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEUTZIUS WILLIAM J.