This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/01/2021 at 09:29:14 (UTC).

HEIDARI LAW GROUP, A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION VS MARIA JIMENITA CASTILLO-SEVILLA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 HEIDARI LAW GROUP, A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against MARIA JIMENITA CASTILLO-SEVILLA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4102

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Petitioner

HEIDARI LAW GROUP A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

Respondents and Cross Defendants

TELLEZ JOCELYN

TELLEZ MEJIA DIEGO

HONKA D.C. THOMAS MARTIN

CASTILLO-SEVILLA MARIA JIMENITA

HEIDARI LAW GROUP A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION

Cross Plaintiff and Respondent

HONKA D.C. THOMAS MARTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Petitioner Attorney

MILETIC THOMAS J.

Respondent and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

NESBIT ALAN

Other Attorneys

HEIDARI SAM RYAN

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...) of 09/02/2021

9/2/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...) of 09/02/2021

Supplemental Declaration (name extension) - Supplemental Declaration OF SAM RYAN HEIDARI, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANT HEIDARI LAW GROUPS REPLY BRIEF

8/25/2021: Supplemental Declaration (name extension) - Supplemental Declaration OF SAM RYAN HEIDARI, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANT HEIDARI LAW GROUPS REPLY BRIEF

Supplemental Declaration (name extension) - Supplemental Declaration OF SHAWN KAHROBA, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANT HEIDARI LAW GROUPS REPLY BRIEF

8/25/2021: Supplemental Declaration (name extension) - Supplemental Declaration OF SHAWN KAHROBA, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANT HEIDARI LAW GROUPS REPLY BRIEF

Objection (name extension) - Objection PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT HEIDARI LAW GROUPS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF ALAN NESBIT, ESQ.

8/20/2021: Objection (name extension) - Objection PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT HEIDARI LAW GROUPS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF ALAN NESBIT, ESQ.

Reply (name extension) - Reply CROSS-DEFENDANT HEIDARI LAW GROUPS REPLY BRIEF TO CROSS-PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE CROSS-PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT OR PORTIONS THEREOF PURSUAN

8/20/2021: Reply (name extension) - Reply CROSS-DEFENDANT HEIDARI LAW GROUPS REPLY BRIEF TO CROSS-PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE CROSS-PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT OR PORTIONS THEREOF PURSUAN

Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion) - Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)

4/29/2021: Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion) - Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF SHAWN KAHROBA

4/29/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF SHAWN KAHROBA

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF SAM RYAN HEIDARI IN SUPPORT OF EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING

4/2/2021: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF SAM RYAN HEIDARI IN SUPPORT OF EXTENSION TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING

Answer - Answer

4/9/2021: Answer - Answer

Answer - Answer

4/9/2021: Answer - Answer

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Complaint)

4/19/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition Complaint)

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

1/27/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt - Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Answer - Answer

2/1/2021: Answer - Answer

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

2/3/2021: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

12/14/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/14/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

12/14/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/14/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • Hearing06/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 26 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...) of 09/02/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketHearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion) scheduled for 09/02/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 updated: Result Date to 09/02/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration OF SAM RYAN HEIDARI, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANT HEIDARI LAW GROUPS REPLY BRIEF; Filed by: Heidari Law Group, a California Professional Corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration OF SHAWN KAHROBA, ESQ. IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-DEFENDANT HEIDARI LAW GROUPS REPLY BRIEF; Filed by: Heidari Law Group, a California Professional Corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketReply CROSS-DEFENDANT HEIDARI LAW GROUPS REPLY BRIEF TO CROSS-PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO CROSS-DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE CROSS-PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT OR PORTIONS THEREOF PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 425.16;; Filed by: Heidari Law Group, a California Professional Corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketObjection PLAINTIFF/CROSS-DEFENDANT HEIDARI LAW GROUPS EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO THE DECLARATION OF ALAN NESBIT, ESQ. Filed by: Heidari Law Group, a California Professional Corporation (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketOpposition to Special Motion to Strike; Filed by: Thomas Martin Honka, D.C. (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • DocketHearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion) scheduled for 09/02/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Thomas Martin Honka, D.C. (Respondent); As to: Heidari Law Group, a California Professional Corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by: Heidari Law Group, a California Professional Corporation (Petitioner); As to: Thomas Martin Honka, D.C. (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketHearing on Petition Complaint scheduled for 04/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Heidari Law Group, a California Professional Corporation (Petitioner); As to: Maria Jimenita Castillo-Sevilla (Respondent); Diego Tellez Mejia (Respondent); Jocelyn Tellez (Respondent) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Heidari Law Group, a California Professional Corporation (Petitioner); As to: Maria Jimenita Castillo-Sevilla (Respondent); Diego Tellez Mejia (Respondent); Jocelyn Tellez (Respondent) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Heidari Law Group, a California Professional Corporation (Petitioner); As to: Maria Jimenita Castillo-Sevilla (Respondent); Diego Tellez Mejia (Respondent); Jocelyn Tellez (Respondent) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 20STCP04102 Hearing Date: September 2, 2021 Dept: 26

Heidari Law Group, APC v. Castillo-Sevilla, et\r\nal. 20STCP04102

SPECIAL\r\nMOTION TO STRIKE COMPLAINT

\r\n\r\n

(CCP § 425.16)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

TENTATIVE RULING:

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Cross-Defendant\r\nHeidari Law Group, APC’s Special Motion to Strike is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

ANALYSIS:

On December 14, 2020,\r\nHeidari Law Group, APC filed the\r\ninstant interpleader action against Maria Jimenita Castillo-Sevilla, Diego\r\nTellez Mejia, Jocelyn Tellez and Thomas Martin Honka, D.C. dba Honka\r\nChiropractic Pain Relief Clinic. Thomas Martin Honka, D.C. dba Honka\r\nChiropractic Pain Relief Clinic (“Cross-Complainant”) filed a Cross-Complaint\r\nagainst Heidari Law Group, APC (“Cross-Defendant”) on February 3, 2021. Cross-Defendant\r\nfiled the instant Special Motion to Strike the Cross-Complaint on April 29,\r\n2021.

Special Motions to Strike pursuant to Code of Civil\r\nProcedure section 425.16 are not permitted in courts of limited jurisdiction. (1550\r\nLaurel Owner’s Association, Inc. v. Appellate Division of the Superior Court of\r\nLos Angeles County (2018) 28 Cal.App.5th 1146, 1151-1155 [the restriction\r\non motions to strike imposed by Code of Civil Procedure section 92, subdivision\r\n(d) also precludes special motions to strike under Code of Civil Procedure\r\nsection 425.16].)

Therefore, the Special Motion to Strike the Complaint Pursuant\r\nto Code of Civil Procedure section 425.16 is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n\r\n

Court clerk to give notice.

'

Case Number: 20STCP04102    Hearing Date: April 19, 2021    Dept: 26

Heidari Law Group, APC v. Castillo-Sevilla, et al.

HEARING ON PETITION

(None)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Hearing on Petition is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. THE MATTER IS SET FOR TRIAL ON JUNE 14, 2022 AT 8:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

SUMMARY OF COMPLAINT: Interpleader action.

ANALYSIS:

On December 14, 2020, Plaintiff Heidari Law Group, APC (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant interpleader action against Defendants Maria Jimenita Castillo-Sevilla, Diego Tellez Mejia, Jocelyn Tellez and Thomas Martin Honka, D.C. (“Defendant Honka”). To date, only Defendant Honka has been served and responded to the Complaint.

The case was incorrectly designated “Other Civil Petition” and set for hearing with respect to the non-existent petition on April 19, 2021. Accordingly, the Court changes the designation of this case from “Other Civil Petition” to “Other Complaint (Non-Tort/Non-Complex)” and takes the hearing on the non-existent petition off calendar. The matter is set for trial on June 14, 2022 at 8:30 am in Department 26 in the Spring Street Courthouse.

Plaintiff to give notice.

 

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEIDARI LAW GROUP A CALIFORNIA PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HEIDARI SAM