This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/22/2020 at 01:55:27 (UTC).

HEAVY DUTY CONSTRUCTION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS CHAN YUNG LIN

Case Summary

On 08/26/2019 HEAVY DUTY CONSTRUCTION INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against CHAN YUNG LIN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3721

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HEAVY DUTY CONSTRUCTION INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Respondent

LIN CHAN YUNG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

O'BRIEN MARK M

Respondent Attorney

ALKANA EUGENE

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Status Conference)

10/19/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Status Conference)

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

4/27/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order - Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition for Order to Compel Arbitration)

12/30/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Petition for Order to Compel Arbitration)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition for Order to Compel Arbitration) of 12/30/2019

12/30/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition for Order to Compel Arbitration) of 12/30/2019

Reply (name extension) - Reply Petitioner Heavy Duty Constructions inc's Reply

11/4/2019: Reply (name extension) - Reply Petitioner Heavy Duty Constructions inc's Reply

Response (name extension) - Response Respondent's Response to Petitioner's Petition for Order to Compel Arbitration

10/1/2019: Response (name extension) - Response Respondent's Response to Petitioner's Petition for Order to Compel Arbitration

Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

8/26/2019: Notice of Hearing on Petition - Notice of Hearing on Petition

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/26/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Petition (name extension) - Petition for Order to Compel Arbitration

8/26/2019: Petition (name extension) - Petition for Order to Compel Arbitration

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

8/26/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

8/26/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • Hearing04/20/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Status Conference)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketAddress for Eugene Alkana (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketPursuant to oral stipulation, Status Conference scheduled for 10/19/2020 at 09:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 04/20/2021 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Status Conference scheduled for 06/17/2020 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 10/19/2020 09:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • DocketStatus Conference scheduled for 06/17/2020 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Petition for Order to Compel Arbitration)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Petition for Order to Compel Arbitration) of 12/30/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketHearing on Petition for Order to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 12/30/2019 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 12/30/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketReply Petitioner Heavy Duty Constructions inc's Reply; Filed by: HEAVY DUTY CONSTRUCTION INC. a California corporation (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketResponse Respondent's Response to Petitioner's Petition for Order to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: CHAN YUNG LIN (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketHearing on Petition for Order to Compel Arbitration scheduled for 12/30/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketPetition for Order to Compel Arbitration; Filed by: HEAVY DUTY CONSTRUCTION INC. a California corporation (Petitioner); As to: CHAN YUNG LIN (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: HEAVY DUTY CONSTRUCTION INC. a California corporation (Petitioner); As to: CHAN YUNG LIN (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STCP03721    Hearing Date: December 30, 2019    Dept: 94

PETITION MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

(CCP §§ 1281.2, et seq., 638)

TENTATIVE RULING: Petitioner Heavy Duty Construction, Inc.’s Petition to Compel Arbitration is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

ANALYSIS:

I.  Background & Discussion

On August 26, 2019, Petitioner Heavy Duty Construction, Inc. (“Petitioner”) filed this Petition to Compel Arbitration (the “Petition”) against Respondent Chan Yung Lin (“Respondent”) stemming from contracts for commercial property improvements (the “Contracts”). No proof of service for the Notice of Motion and Motion has been filed.

On October 1, 2019, Respondent filed a Response, stating that the contracts in question were signed by Respondent’s mother, Pi Chao Chen (“Chen”), and that the Petition should be amended to reflect the correct respondent. (Resp., ¶¶ 8, 20.)

On November 4, 2019, Petitioner filed a reply and an Agreement Designating Arbitrator executed by the parties. (Reply, Exhs. A1, A2.) Petitioner requests the hearing for this Motion be taken off calendar and that the matter be set for a status conference in 180 days.

II.  Conclusion & Order

Based on the foregoing, Petitioner Heavy Duty Construction, Inc.’s Petition to Compel Arbitration is PLACED OFF CALENDAR. A status conference is set for June 17, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. in Department 94.

Court clerk to give notice.