This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/16/2021 at 05:37:10 (UTC).

HAYLEY CAMILLE FREEDMAN VS RICHARD D'ALESSIO

Case Summary

On 08/10/2020 HAYLEY CAMILLE FREEDMAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RICHARD D'ALESSIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6670

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FREEDMAN HAYLEY CAMILLE

Defendant

D'ALESSIO RICHARD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ANDERSON EDWARD M.

YEH REGINA Y

YEH REGINA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion for Order to File Document Under Seal: Filed By: HAYLEY CAMILLE FREEDMAN (Plaintiff); Result: Off Calendar; Result Date: 11/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion for Order to File Document Under Seal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Motion for Order to File Document Under Seal) of 11/02/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion for Order to File Document Under Seal scheduled for 11/02/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court on 11/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion for Order to File Document Under Seal: Name Extension changed from Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion to File Document Under Seal; Declaration of Regina Yeh, Esq. In Support Thereof to to File Document Under Seal; Document changed from Motion to Seal (name extension) to Motion for Order (name extension); As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 11/02/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Type changed from Hearing on Motion to Seal (name extension) to Hearing on Motion for Order (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketNotice OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OR ORDER; Filed by: HAYLEY CAMILLE FREEDMAN (Plaintiff); As to: RICHARD D'ALESSIO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff HAYLEY CAMILLE FREEDMAN against Defendant RICHARD D'ALESSIO on the Complaint filed by HAYLEY CAMILLE FREEDMAN on 08/10/2020 for damages of $20,000.00, attorney fees of $16,607.50, interest of $4,750.73, and costs of $2,763.12 for a total of $44,121.35.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketJudgment; Signed and Filed by: HAYLEY CAMILLE FREEDMAN (Plaintiff); As to: RICHARD D'ALESSIO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment: As To Parties changed from RICHARD D'ALESSIO (Defendant) to RICHARD D'ALESSIO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR ORDER OF PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION; AND DECLARATION OF REGINA YEH, ESQ. IN SUPPORT THEREOF scheduled for 02/01/2021 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • DocketUpdated -- Regina Y Yeh (Attorney): First Name changed from REGINA to Regina; Last Name changed from YEH to Yeh; Organization Name changed from ANDERSON YEH PC to Anderson Yeh Pc; Middle Name: Y

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/07/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/14/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: HAYLEY CAMILLE FREEDMAN (Plaintiff); As to: RICHARD D'ALESSIO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: HAYLEY CAMILLE FREEDMAN (Plaintiff); As to: RICHARD D'ALESSIO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: HAYLEY CAMILLE FREEDMAN (Plaintiff); As to: RICHARD D'ALESSIO (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: 20STLC06670 Hearing Date: November 2, 2021 Dept: 26

Freedman v. D’Alessio,\r\net al. 20STLC06670

MOTION\r\nTO SEAL RECORDS

\r\n\r\n

(CRC\r\nRULE 2.551)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

TENTATIVE RULING:

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Plaintiff Hayley Camille Freedman’s Motion to File Records\r\nUnder Seal is PLACED OFF CALENDAR AS MOOT.

ANALYSIS:

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Plaintiff Hayley\r\nCamille Freedman (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for breach of\r\nsettlement agreement against Defendant Richard D’Alession (“Defendant”) on August\r\n10, 2020. Following Defendant’s failure to file a responsive pleading, the\r\nCourt entered default against Defendant on June 29, 2021.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Plaintiff filed the\r\ninstant Motion to File Documents Under Seal (“the Motion”) on September 28,\r\n2021. On October 21, 2021, the Court granted Plaintiff’s request for\r\ndefault judgment, entering judgment in Plaintiff’s favor and against Defendant.\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Plaintiff moves to seal Exhibit\r\n1 attached to the declaration of Edward M. Anderson, Esq. filed in support of\r\nthe Request for Default Judgment. (Motion, Notice, p. ii, lns. 5-8.) A copy of the exhibit was conditionally lodged\r\nunder seal. (Notice of Lodging, 09/28/21.)

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

In light of the default judgment\r\nentered in Plaintiff’s favor and against Defendant on October 21, 2021, Plaintiff’s\r\nrequest to file documents in support of the request for default judgment under\r\nseal is now moot.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Plaintiff Hayley Camille Freedman’s Motion to File Records\r\nUnder Seal is PLACED OFF CALENDAR AS MOOT.

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

\r\n\r\n

Court clerk to give notice.

'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDERSON EDWARD M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer YEH REGINA Y