This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2017 at 16:50:53 (UTC).

HAWTHORNE MOTORS SELECT INC VS EVIA THOMAS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/28/2016 HAWTHORNE MOTORS SELECT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against EVIA THOMAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6075

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAWTHORNE MOTORS SELECT INC DBA HAWTHORNE MOTORS PRE-OWNED DBA HAWTHORNE MOTORS PRE-OWNED

Defendants

THOMAS EVIA

TUCKER ERVIN

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

12/28/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

12/28/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

12/28/2016: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Affidavit (name extension) - DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

1/23/2017: Affidavit (name extension) - DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - SERVED: ERVIN TUCKER / HUSBAND

1/23/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - SERVED: ERVIN TUCKER / HUSBAND

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

1/23/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

3/1/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order of 03/01/2017

3/1/2017: Minute Order of 03/01/2017

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

3/1/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Taken off Calendar by Party on 03/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims): Result: Result Date: 03/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service SERVED: ERVIN TUCKER / HUSBAND: Result: Result Date: 03/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Affidavit DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE: Result: Result Date: 03/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 03/01/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketOrder for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to plaintiff request

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Hawthorne Motors Select Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Hawthorne Motors Select Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Ervin Tucker (Defendant); Service Cost: 85.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 01/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service SERVED: ERVIN TUCKER / HUSBAND; Filed by: Hawthorne Motors Select Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Evia Thomas (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/18/17; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2017
  • DocketAffidavit DECLARATION OF DUE DILIGENCE; Filed by: Hawthorne Motors Select Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Ervin Tucker (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Small Claims <= $1,500: Filing for $1,500 or less- CCP 116.230(b)(1); Fee: $30.00; Payment: 30.00 Receipt: 1170103E2099 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • DocketInvoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170103E2099 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/01/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name): Name Extension: (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Hawthorne Motors Select Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Evia Thomas (Defendant); Ervin Tucker (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • DocketNotice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • DocketNotice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HAWTHORNE MOTORS SELECT INC DBA HAWTHORNE MOTORS PRE-OWNED DBA HAWTHORNE MOTORS PRE-OWNED is a litigant