This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/21/2021 at 00:49:43 (UTC).

HARTFIELD CONSTRUCTION CORP. VS TAMMY WOLOSKI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/06/2019 HARTFIELD CONSTRUCTION CORP filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against TAMMY WOLOSKI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4406

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

HARTFIELD CONSTRUCTION CORP.

Defendants

WOLOSKI TAMMY

K D PROPERTIES INVESTMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ALIAS KD PROPERTIES INVESTMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

KD PROPERTIES INVESTMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

DOES 1 THROUGH 100

K D PROPERTIES INVESTMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

K D PROPERTIES INVESTMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY ALIAS KD PROPERTIES INVESTMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

PHELPS DANIEL J.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

HERRON CURTIS W

DE LA MORA ANNABELLE

HERRON CURTIS WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

9/22/2020: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information - Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation and Proposed Order re Trial Date

10/5/2020: Stipulation and Order (name extension) - Stipulation and Order Stipulation and Proposed Order re Trial Date

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike) of 11/18/2019

11/18/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Hearing on Demurrer - without Motion to Strike) of 11/18/2019

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition Notice of Non-Opposition to Demurrer to Cross-Complaint

11/4/2019: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition Notice of Non-Opposition to Demurrer to Cross-Complaint

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

11/4/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

10/18/2019: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

10/17/2019: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike - Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

9/30/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

9/19/2019: Substitution of Attorney - Substitution of Attorney

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

9/4/2019: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Answer - Answer

9/4/2019: Answer - Answer

Answer - Answer

9/4/2019: Answer - Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/1/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/1/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/1/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Pendency of Action

5/20/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Pendency of Action

Summons - Summons on Complaint

5/6/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5/6/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • Hearing08/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Tax Costs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketNotice OF WITHDRAWAL OF MEMORANDUM OF COSTS; Filed by: Hartfield Construction Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Tammy Woloski (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Tax Costs scheduled for 08/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketMotion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Hartfield Construction Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketMotion to Tax Costs; Filed by: Hartfield Construction Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: Hartfield Construction Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Tammy Woloski (Defendant); Total Costs: 98.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketMemorandum of Costs (Summary); Filed by: Tammy Woloski (Defendant); As to: Hartfield Construction Corp. (Plaintiff); Total Costs: 1368.70

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by: Hartfield Construction Corp. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/09/2022 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Hartfield Construction Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: K D PROPERTIES INVESTMENT, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/28/2019; Service Cost: 98.75; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Action; Filed by: Hartfield Construction Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Tammy Woloski (Defendant); K D PROPERTIES INVESTMENT, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/09/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/02/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Hartfield Construction Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Tammy Woloski (Defendant); K D PROPERTIES INVESTMENT, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Hartfield Construction Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Tammy Woloski (Defendant); K D PROPERTIES INVESTMENT, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Hartfield Construction Corp. (Plaintiff); As to: Tammy Woloski (Defendant); K D PROPERTIES INVESTMENT, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC04406    Hearing Date: November 18, 2019    Dept: 94

Hartfield Constr. Corp. v. K D Properties Investment, LLC, et al.

DEMURRER

(CCP § 430.10 et seq.)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Cross-Defendant Hartfield Construction Corporation’s Demurrer to the Second Cause of Action for Negligence in the Cross-Complaint is PLACED OFF CALENDAR AS MOOT.

ANALYSIS:

On May 6, 2019, Hartfield Construction Corporation filed a Complaint for breach of contract, common counts, and foreclosure of mechanic’s lien against Tammy Woloski and K D Properties Investment, LLC. K D Properties Investment, LLC (“Cross-Complainant”) filed a Cross-Complaint for breach of contract, negligence and common counts against Hartfield Construction Corporation (“Cross-Defendant”) on September 4, 2019. On October 17, 2019, Cross-Defendant filed the instant Demurrer to the second cause of action for negligence only in the Cross-Complaint. On November 4, 2019, Cross-Complainant dismissed the second cause of action for negligence and filed a notice of non-opposition to the demurrer.

In light of the dismissal of the second cause of action for negligence in the Cross-Complaint, the hearing on the Demurrer to the same is PLACED OFF CALENDAR AS MOOT.

Court clerk to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARTFIELD CONSTRUCTION CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PHELPS DANIEL J